Butts v. United States of America

Petitioner: Paul Richard Butts
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2010cv02104
Filed: September 30, 2010
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Referring Judge: David K Duncan
Presiding Judge: Mary H Murguia
Nature of Suit: Motions to Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 20, 2011 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - that Petitioner's motion (Doc. 21) is denied. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 6/20/2011. (KMG)
April 29, 2011 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION 14 ; Petitioner's motion for relief under § 2255 (Doc. 1) is denied. Denying 18 Petitioner's Motion for Certificate of Appealability. The Clerk shall terminate this action. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 4/29/11. (DMT)
January 4, 2011 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the reference to the Magistrate Judge is withdraw with respect to Movant's December 16, 2010 Motion for Recusal. All other matters must remain with the Magistrate Judge as appropriate. Denying 6 Movant's Motion for Recusal. Signed by Judge Mary H Murguia on 1/3/11.(DMT)
November 29, 2010 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Ground One of the 2255 Motion is dismissed; denying 3 Movant's Motion for Discovery. The Clerk of Court must serve a copy of the 2255 Motion (Doc. 1) and this Order on the United States Attorney for the District of Arizona. The parties a nd the Clerk of Court must file all documents related to the 2255 Motion in the civil case. The United States Attorney for the District of Arizona has 60 days from the date of service to answer. This matter is referred to Magistrate Judge David K. Duncan. Signed by Judge Mary H Murguia on 11/22/10.(TLJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Butts v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: Sharon K Sexton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Paul Richard Butts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?