Brewster v. Arpaio et al
Plaintiff: Ulyess Kelvin Brewster
Defendant: Joseph M Arpaio
Case Number: 2:2010cv02386
Filed: November 4, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Robert C Broomfield
Presiding Judge: David K Duncan
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER - (1) The reference to the Magistrate Judge is withdrawn as to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 17). (2) Defendants Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 17) is granted. Plaintiff's action is dismissed without prejudice for lack of exhaustion or alternately, for failure to respond. The Clerk of Court must enter judgment accordingly. (See document for further details). Signed by Judge Robert C Broomfield on 7/20/11.(LAD)
March 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - IT IS ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint without further notice to Plaintiff if he fails to show cause within 21 days for his failure to comply with the Court's orders. Signed by Judge Robert C Broomfield on 3/6/11. (SAT)
January 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER (Service Packet) - The Clerk of Court must send Plaintiff a service packet including the First Amended Complaint (Doc. 7), this Order, and both summons and request for waiver forms for Defendant Arpaio. This matter is referred to Magistrate Jud ge David K. Duncan pursuant to Rules 72.1 and 72.2 of the Local Rules of Civil Procedure for all pretrial proceedings as authorized under 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1). (See document for full details). Signed by Judge Robert C Broomfield on 1/20/11. (LAD)
December 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made from Prison Account of Ulyess Kelvin Brewster. Signed by Judge Robert C Broomfield on 11/30/10. (REW)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brewster v. Arpaio et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ulyess Kelvin Brewster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph M Arpaio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?