Ajanovic v. O.F.F. Enterprises Limited

Plaintiff: Mirisa Ajanovic
Defendant: O.F.F. Enterprises Limited
Case Number: 2:2010cv02487
Filed: November 17, 2010
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 18, 2012 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Defendant's 19 Motion to Dismiss is granted. The Clerk shall terminate this action. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 6/18/2012. (LFIG)
February 21, 2012 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: 1. The motion to dismiss (Doc. 10) is granted. 2. The motion to strike (Doc. 16) is denied as moot. 3. The amended complaint (Doc. 5) is dismissed without prejudice for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. 4. Plaintiff shall have until March 9, 2012 to file, consistent with this order, a second amended complaint. The Clerk is directed to terminate this action without further order of the Court if Plaintiff fails to meet this deadline. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 2/21/12.(LAD)
February 25, 2011 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Plaintiff's complaint (Doc. 1) is dismised without prejudice for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Plaintiff has until 3/18/11 to file an amnended complaint. The Clerk shall terminate this action if Plaintiff fails to comply with this deadline. Plaintiff's 3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is denied as moot. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 2/25/11.(TLJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ajanovic v. O.F.F. Enterprises Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: O.F.F. Enterprises Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mirisa Ajanovic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?