Ramos v. Wal-Mart

Plaintiff: Tomas Ramos
Defendant: Wal-Mart
Case Number: 2:2010cv02508
Filed: November 19, 2010
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Neil V Wake
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 11, 2011 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the Clerk shall enter judgment dismissing 11 Plaintiff's Fourth Amended Complaint with prejudice. The Clerk shall terminate this case. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 3/11/11. (LSP)
February 14, 2011 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Plaintiff's 9 Amended Complaint is dismissed with leave to file an amended complaint by 03/11/11. If Plaintiff elects not to file an amended complaint by 03/11/11, the Clerk shall dismiss this action without further order of this Court . FURTHER ORDERED that if Plaintiff elects to file an amended complaint, the complaint may not be served until and unless the Court screens the amended complaint pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2). Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 02/14/11. (NKS)
December 29, 2010 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing with leave to amend by 1/28/2011 5 Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. The Clerk shall dismiss this action after 1/28/2011 if Plaintiff fails to comply. See PDF document for details. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 12/29/10. (LSP)
November 29, 2010 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 2 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, Plaintiff shall be responsible for service by waiver of the summons and complaint. Plaintiff's Complaint is dismissed with leave to amend by 12/23/2010. If Plaintiff fails to comply the Clerk shall dismiss this action without further order of this Court. See PDF document for details. Signed by Judge Roslyn O Silver on 11/29/10.(LSP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ramos v. Wal-Mart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tomas Ramos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?