Parker v. Adu-Tutu et al

Plaintiff: Mark Steven Parker
Defendant: Y Elliott, W Hackney, Unknown Adu-Tutu, Dinnis Kendal, Unknown Phen, Unknown Chitwood, Charles L Ryan, C McWilliams, Unknown Parties, Unknown Thunderwood and M Espinoza
Case Number: 2:2010cv02747
Filed: December 20, 2010
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Pinal
Referring Judge: Edward C Voss (PS)
Presiding Judge: G Murray Snow
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 2, 2013 164 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the reference to the Magistrate Judge is withdrawn as to Defendant's 129 Motion for Summary Judgment and Plaintiff's 161 Motion to Put Court on Notice of Due Process Violations. ORDERED Defendant's 129 Motion for Sum mary Judgment is granted. Plaintiff's 161 Motion to Put Court on Notice of Due Process Violations is denied as moot. The Clerk of Court must enter judgment accordingly and terminate the action. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 4/2/2013.(LFIG)
August 2, 2012 126 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 111 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel for Photocopying Services. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 8/2/12.(LSP)
June 28, 2012 119 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the Magistrate Judge's November 15, 2011 45 Order and the Court'sFebruary 16, 2012 80 Order are vacated.Plaintiff's 37 Motion for Access to a Wordprocessor is denied. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 6/28/2012. (LFIG)
May 23, 2012 112 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The reference to the Magistrate Judge is withdrawn as to Plaintiff's 92 Motion for Reconsideration and the Motion is granted. Upon reconsideration of Plaintiff's 29 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, the Motion is denied. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 5/22/2012. (LFIG)
March 22, 2012 96 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER the reference to the Magistrate Judge is withdrawn as to Plainitff's Motion for Reconsideration 92 . Within 15 days from the date of this Order, Defendant must file a response. Within 10 days of receipt of Defendant's response, Plaintiff may file a reply. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 3/22/12. (TLJ)
February 13, 2012 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 29 Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 2/13/12.(LSP)
November 1, 2011 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER The reference to Magistrate Judge Edward C. Voss is withdrawn only with respect to Plaintiff's "Motion For Reconsideration" Doc. 38 . Plaintiff"s "Motion For Reconsideration" (Doc. 38) is denied. All other matters must remain with Magistrate Judge Edward C. Voss for disposition as appropriate. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 11/1/11.(KMG)
August 17, 2011 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 27 Plaintiff's MOTION (Application) to Proceed in Forma Pauperis and 31 MOTION for extraordinary circumstance exist for delay filing. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED denying 34 Plaintiff's MOTION for Due Process Violation and Injunctive Relief. Defendants Unknown Kenter, Unknown Phen, Charles L Ryan, Unknown Thunderwood, John Doe Food Service Canteen Manager, Unknown Adu-Tutu and Unknown Chitwood are dismissed from this action for failure to state a claim upon which r elief may be granted. Plaintiff's claims under the Americans with Disabilities Act and the Rehabilitation Act, and Counts IV, V, VI, VII, and IX of 26 Second Amended Complaint are dismissed for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. Defendant Rowe must answer Counts II, III, and VIII of 26 Second Amended Complaint. The Clerk must send to Plaintiff a service packet including 26 Second Amended Complaint, "Plaintiff's Motion For Preliminary Injunction"( Doc. 29), Plaintiff's "Memorandum Of Law In Support Of Plaintiff's Motion For Preliminary Injunction" (Doc. 30), this Order, and both summons and request for waiver forms for Defendant Rowe. Plaintiff must complete and return the service packet to the Clerk of Court within 21 days of the date of filing of this Order. This matter is referred to Magistrate Judge Edward C. Voss pursuant to Rules 72.1 and 72.2 of the Local Rules of Civil Procedure for all pretrial proceedings. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 8/17/11. (LSP)
January 11, 2011 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: Pla's "Motion For Leave To File An Amended Complaint To Injunction For Writ Of Habeas Corpus" (Doc. 6 ) and second "Application To Proceed In Forma Pauperis By A Prisoner (Habeas)" (Doc. 7 ) are denie d without prejudice as moot. If Pla fails to comply with the Court's January 4, 2011 Order (Doc. 5 ) within 30 days from the filing date of that Order, the Clerk of Court must, without further notice, enter a jgm of dismissal of this action without prejudice. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 1/11/11. (SAT)
January 4, 2011 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: The pleading entitled "Order To Cause For A[n] Injunction For Writ Of Habeas Corpus By A Person In State Custody" (Doc. 1 ), which the Court construes as a civil rights Complaint brought pursuant to 42 U.S.C. § 1983, is dismissed without prejudice, with leave to amend. Petitioner has 30 days from the date this Order is filed to file a first amended complaint that complies with this Order. Petitioner's pleading entitled "Injunction For a Writ Of Ha beas Corpus By A Person In State Custody" (Doc. 2 ), which the Clerk of Court has docketed as a Motion, is denied without prejudice. Petitioner's "Application To Proceed In Forma Pauperis By A Prisoner (Habeas)"(Doc. 3 ) is deni ed without prejudice. Within 30 days of the date this Order is filed, Petitioner must either pay the $350.00 filing fee or file a completed "Application To Proceed In Forma Pauperis By APrisoner Civil (Non-Habeas)" on the form provided with this Order and a certified six-month trust account statement from the ADOC's Central Office. If Petitioner fails to comply with this order, the Clerk of Court must enter a jgm of dismissal of this action without prejudice and without further notice to Petitioner. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 1/4/11. (SAT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parker v. Adu-Tutu et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Y Elliott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W Hackney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Adu-Tutu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dinnis Kendal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Phen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Chitwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles L Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C McWilliams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Thunderwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M Espinoza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Steven Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?