Bodie v. Tipten et al

Plaintiff: Andy Charles Bodie
Defendant: Unknown Tipten and Unknown Locthert
Case Number: 2:2010cv02788
Filed: December 27, 2010
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Pinal
Referring Judge: Edward C Voss (PS)
Presiding Judge: Robert C Broomfield
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 25, 2012 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO STOP PAYMENT OF FILING FEE from Prison Account of Andy Charles Bodie re fee in Ninth Circuit Case No. 11-17845. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 10/25/2012. (LFIG)
November 7, 2011 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 35 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. The Clerk must enter judgment accordingly and terminate this action. Signed by Judge Robert C Broomfield on 11/7/11.(LSP)
May 11, 2011 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 15 Order Directing Prisoner Payment from Plaintiff's trust account is VACATED. The Clerk must serve by mail a copy of this Order on the Director of Arizona Department of Corrections and the Financial Administration for Phoenix Division of the Clerks Office. Signed by Judge Robert C Broomfield on 5/11/11. (LSP)
February 22, 2011 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 5 Plaintiff's Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Within 30 days of the date this Order is filed, Plaintiff must either pay the $350.00 filing fee or file a completed Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Clerk must enter dismissal without prejudice if Plaintiff fails to comply. Signed by Judge Robert C Broomfield on 2/19/11. (Attachments: # 1 IFP Form). (LSP)
January 3, 2011 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 2 Plaintiff's Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Within 30 days of the date this Order is filed, Plaintiff must either pay the $350.00 filing fee or file a completed Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Clerk must enter dismissal without prejudice if Plaintiff fails to comply. Signed by Judge Robert C Broomfield on 1/3/11. (Attachments: # 1 IFP Form). (LSP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bodie v. Tipten et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Tipten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Locthert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andy Charles Bodie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?