In Re: Oladiran

Amicus: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2010mc00025
Filed: February 26, 2010
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: Civil Miscellaneous Case

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 21, 2010 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - 1. The Court finds by clear and convincing evidence that attorney Tajudeen Oladiran has violated Ethical Rules 1.1, 1.3, 3.1, 3.5(d), 4.4(a) and 8.4(d). 2. Mr. Oladiran is suspended from the practice of law before this Court for six months. T his suspension shall run from October 1, 2010, to April 1, 2011. 3. The Court anticipates that judges of this Court in any cases where Mr. Oladiran currently is appearing will afford him and his clients reasonable time to arrange substitute counsel. (See document for full details). Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 9/21/10. (LAD)
July 15, 2010 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER a hearing on the OSC charges is set for 8/12/10 at 1:00 p.m. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 7/14/10. (TLJ)
May 3, 2010 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 2 Motion for Discovery. This case will proceed as outlined above. (See document for full details). Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 5/3/10.(LAD)
March 23, 2010 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER The United States Attorney for the District of Arizona, Dennis Burke, or his designee, is appointed to investigate and prosecute ethical violations alleged in the Order to Show Cause (Dkt. #1). Mr. Burke shall file a notice of designation decis ion by April 9, 2010. Mr. Oladiran's request 3 for status conference is granted. A status conference is set for April 21, 2010 at 10:00 a.m. Mr. Oladiran and the designated prosecutor may each file a seven-page case management memorandum by Ap ril 16, 2010. The Clerk is directed to deliver a copy of this order to the United States Attorney's Office for the District of Arizona. The Court' staff will also email a copy of this order to the United States Attorney's Office to ensure that the schedule set forth above can be met. Status Conference set for 4/21/2010 10:00 AM in Courtroom 603, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge David G Campbell. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 3/23/10.(KMG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re: Oladiran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: United States of America
Represented By: Peter Michael Lantka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?