Alisic v. United States of America

Petitioner: Adnan Alisic
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2011cv00063
Filed: January 7, 2011
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Referring Judge: Mark E Aspey (PS)
Nature of Suit: Motions to Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 23, 2012 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 20 Plaintiff's Motion to Reopen Judgment; denying 21 Plaintiff's Motion to Amend. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 4/23/12.(TLJ)
March 2, 2012 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that movant Adnan Alisic's motion for reconsideration (Doc. 18 ) is denied. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 3/2/2012.(KMG)
February 3, 2012 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Alisic's motion to dismiss grounds 1-9 (Doc. 6 ) is denied as moot. Alisic's request for an evidentiary hearing (Doc. 4 ) is denied. Magistrate Judge Mark E. Aspey's R&R (Doc. 9 ) is accepted. Alisic's amended motion to v acate, set aside, or correct sentence (Doc. 4) is denied. A certificate of appealability and leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal are denied. The Clerk of the Court is directed to terminate this action. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 2/3/2012. (KMG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alisic v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: Mark Brnovich
Represented By: Sharon K Sexton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Adnan Alisic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?