Liberty Media Holdings LLC v. Vinigay.com et al

Plaintiff: Liberty Media Holdings LLC
Defendant: Vinigay.com, Gustavo Paladeski, Unknown Parties and Vinicius Alves
Case Number: 2:2011cv00280
Filed: February 10, 2011
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Lawrence O Anderson
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 28, 2012 43 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OF DECISION AND ORDER approving, incorporating and adopting the 42 Report and Recommendations: IT IS FURTHER ORDERED GRANTING in part and DENYING in part Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment. (Doc. 24.) The Court grants Plaint iff's Motion for Default Judgment against Defendant Gustavo Paladeski. The Court denies Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment against the remaining Defendants. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall enter Judgment in favor of Plaintif f Liberty Media Holdings, LLC and against Defendant Gustavo Paladeski in the amount of $1,006,380.90 ($990,440.40 + $15,940.50 for attorneys fees, costs and travel expenses). The Judgment shall earn interest at the annual federal rate from the date of entry of thisJudgment until paid in full. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED ENTERING a permanent injunction in favor of Plaintiff Liberty Media Holdings, LLC against Defendant Gustavo Paladeski, his agents, representatives, servants, employees, attorneys, successors and assigns, and all others acting in concert or participation with him, enjoining and restraining them from copying, postingor making any other infringing use or infringing distribution of Plaintiff's audiovisual works, ph otographs or other materials. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED ENTERING an order of impoundment pursuant to 17 U.S.C. §§ 503 and 509(a), impounding all infringing copies of Plaintiffs copyrighted works, that are in Defendant Paladeski's possessio n or under his control until the judgment entered herein is paid in full. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED DENYING Plaintiff's request for an order impounding Defendants domain name (vinigay.com), and DENYING an award of pre-judgment interest. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED DISMISSING WITH PREJUDICE the remaining claims alleged in the Amended Complaint, Causes of Action Two, Three and Four. (See document for further details). Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 2/27/12. (LAD)
November 30, 2011 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 39 Response to Order to Show Cause: IT IS ORDERED that the Court's Order to Show Cause, issued November 21, 2011, doc. 38, is hereby DISCHARGED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's request for leave to supplement the reco rd, doc. 39, is GRANTED. Plaintiff's Response to Order to Show Cause and the attached Declaration of Brian Dunlap, doc. 39-1 at 1-2, are hereby deemed part of the default damages record. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs Application for Entry of Default Judgment, doc. 24, remains under advisement for ruling. (See document for details). Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 11/30/11. (LAD)
March 3, 2011 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 5 Motion to Substitute Name of Vinicius Alves for Doe 1, construed as a Motion to File an Amended Complaint because Plaintiff did not need leave of court to file the Amended Complaint FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants Does 2-100 , named in the First Amended Complaint, are DISMISSED without prejudice. FURTHER ORDERED granting 7 Ex Parte Motion for AlternateService on Defendants Vinigay.com, Gustavo Paladeski and Vinicius Alves. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 3/2/11.(MAP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Liberty Media Holdings LLC v. Vinigay.com et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vinigay.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gustavo Paladeski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vinicius Alves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Liberty Media Holdings LLC
Represented By: Marc John Randazza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?