Arizona, State of et al v. Tohono O'odham Nation

Plaintiff: Arizona, State of, Gila River Indian Community and Salt River Pima-Maricopa Indian Community
Defendant: Tohono O'odham Nation
Case Number: 2:2011cv00296
Filed: February 14, 2011
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 25, 2013 225 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - 1. Defendant's motion for summary judgment (Doc. 193 ) is granted on all claims, including the claim under Restatement § 201. 2. Plaintiffs motion for partial reconsideration (Doc. 217 ) is denied. 3. The Clerk is ordered to terminate this action. (See document for further details). Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 6/25/13. (LAD)
May 7, 2013 216 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 193 Motion for Summary Judgment with respect to all claims other than Plaintiffs claim for breach of the Compact under Restatement (Second) of Contracts § 201(2); denying 198 Motion for Summary Judgment. Additional briefing ordered by 5/22/2013. See order for details. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 5/7/2013.(NVO)
June 15, 2011 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 33 Motion to Dismiss; finding as moot 24 Motion to Dismiss. The parties shall file a joint status report as required by this order within 10 days of the NIGC's decision or 9/5/2011, whichever is earlier. The parties shall file a joint proposed discovery and motion schedule for the remainder of this case on or before 6/30/2011. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 6/15/2011.(NVO)
March 24, 2011 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - The motion to transfer related case (Doc. 132, CV-10-1993) is granted. The Clerk is directed to transfer Case No. CV-11-296-PHX-NVW to the undersigned Judge. A case management conference will be held by telephone on April 1, 2011, at 11:00 a.m. At least two days prior to the conference, the parties jointly shall file a memorandum setting forth a proposed litigation schedule for this case. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 3/23/11. (KMG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arizona, State of et al v. Tohono O'odham Nation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arizona, State of
Represented By: G Michael Tryon
Represented By: Thomas C Horne
Represented By: Evan Franklin Hiller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gila River Indian Community
Represented By: Linus Everling
Represented By: Merrill C Godfrey
Represented By: Jason Travis Hauter
Represented By: Brian Jay Schulman
Represented By: James P Tuite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Salt River Pima-Maricopa Indian Community
Represented By: Shane M Ham
Represented By: Mary Ruth OGrady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tohono O'odham Nation
Represented By: Samuel Franklin Daughety
Represented By: Brian H Fletcher
Represented By: Jonathan Landis Jantzen
Represented By: Shiva Nagaraj
Represented By: Danielle Spinelli
Represented By: Seth P Waxman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?