Richards et al v. Del Webb Communities Incorporated et al

Plaintiff: Betty Lou Field and Jerry L Richards
Defendant: Unknown Parties, PulteGroup Incorporated, Del Webb Home Construction Incorporated, Pulte Homes Incorporated, Pulte Home Corporation and Del Webb Communities Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2011cv00368
Filed: February 24, 2011
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Roslyn O Silver
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 30, 2013 396 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting the 374 Motion for Attorneys' Fees, Expert Fees, and Non-taxable Expenses. The Clerk of Court is hereby directed to enter judgment against Plaintiff in favor of Defendants/Third-Party Plaintiffs Del Webb Communities, Inc., Del Webb Home Construction, Inc., Pulte Home Corporation, Pulte Development Corporation, and Del Webb Corporation, in the amount of $672,503.18. Signed by Senior Judge Stephen M McNamee on 9/30/2013.(LFIG)
May 8, 2013 392 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 379 Motion to Amend to the limited extent of modifying the Court's prior order to dismissal of Del Webb's third-party claims without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED amending the Court's order of February 11, 2013.( Doc. 372 .) Del Webb's third-party claims are hereby dismissed without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED directing the Clerk to amend the related Judgment located at (Doc. 373 ), to reflect that Del Webb's third-party claims are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Senior Judge Stephen M McNamee on 5/8/13.(LSP)
February 11, 2013 372 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting the 359 Motion to Dismiss. The Clerk of Court shall dismiss with prejudice all claims in this matter. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED dismissing as moot all pending motions in this case. (Doc. 331 ; Doc. 332 ; Doc. 334 ; Doc. 337 .) IT I S FURTHER ORDERED that the Court shall retain jurisdiction in this case for the limited purpose of enforcing the protective order entered on July 30, 2012 (Doc. 255 ), as modified on February 6, 2013 (Doc. 371 ). Signed by Senior Judge Stephen M McNamee on 2/8/13. (LAD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richards et al v. Del Webb Communities Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PulteGroup Incorporated
Represented By: William Albert Nebeker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Del Webb Home Construction Incorporated
Represented By: William Albert Nebeker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pulte Homes Incorporated
Represented By: William Albert Nebeker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pulte Home Corporation
Represented By: William Albert Nebeker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Del Webb Communities Incorporated
Represented By: William Albert Nebeker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Betty Lou Field
Represented By: Michael James White
Represented By: Stephen Lee Weber
Represented By: James William Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry L Richards
Represented By: Michael James White
Represented By: Stephen Lee Weber
Represented By: James William Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?