Aviva USA Corporation et al v. Vazirani et al

Plaintiff: Aviva USA Corporation and Aviva Brands Limited
Defendant: Anil Vazirani, Vazirani & Associates Financial LLC and Secured Financial Solutions LLC
Counter_claimant: Vazirani & Associates Financial LLC, Anil Vazirani and Secured Financial Solutions LLC
Counter_defendant: Aviva Brands Limited and Aviva USA Corporation
Case Number: 2:2011cv00369
Filed: February 24, 2011
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: James A Teilborg
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 16, 2013 264 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Anil Vazirani, Vazirani & Associates Financial, LLC, and Secured Financial Solutions, LLC's 241 Motion for Attorneys' Fees is granted in the amount of $168,888.19. ORDERED that James Regan, and Regan & Associates, LLC 9;s 242 Joinder is denied. ORDERED that Plaintiffs' 243 Motion to Amend the Clerk's Judgment is granted as follows: The Clerk of the Court shall amend the 238 Judgment to include the sanctions award in favor of Plaintiffs and agains t Defendants in the amount of $126,169.20 and the attorneys' fees award in favor of the Defendants Anil Vazirani, Vazirani & Associates Financial, LLC, and Secured Financial Solutions, LLC and against Plaintiffs in the amount of $168,888.19. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 8/16/2013.(LFIG)
October 2, 2012 237 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Aviva's 177 Motion for Summary Judgment is denied in part and granted in part. Aviva's Motion for Summary Judgment is granted solely to the extent it requests summary judgment on the part of Counterclaimants' Countercla im No. 2 that alleges that Aviva's Trade Dress "is not inherently distinctive and has not acquired secondary meaning." Aviva's Motion for Summary Judgment is denied in all other respects. Dismissing Counterclaimants' Coun terclaims, except for the part of Counterclaim No. 2 on which Aviva is granted summary judgment, as set forth herein. Counterclaimants to take nothing on their Counterclaims. Granting the Vazirani Defendants' 174 , 175 Motions for Summary J udgment and the Regan Defendants' 191 Joinder in the Vazirani Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment. The Clerk of the Court shall therefore enter judgment for all Defendants on the claims in Plaintiffs' Complaint. Denying as mo ot the Regan Defendants' 172 Motion for Summary Judgment. Denying as moot the Vazirani Defendants' 228 Motion to Strike Portions of Aviva's Reply in Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment. Granting Aviva's 186 Motion to Seal Document Offered in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment. The Clerk of the Court shall file under seal the exhibit lodged at Doc. 187. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 10/2/12.(DMT)
June 28, 2012 201 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 113 Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney Fees and Related Expenses in the amount of $126,169.20. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 6/28/12. (DMT)
May 10, 2012 169 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 74 Defendants' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings on Plaintiffs' RICO Cause of Action; granting 168 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time Deadline. Dispositive motions now due by 5/15/2012. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 5/9/12.(DMT)
January 10, 2012 101 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiffs' Motion to Dismiss the Vazirani Defendants' Counterclaims 53 is denied without prejudice. Plaintiffs may re- raise this issue on summary judgment if the evidence supports their original arguments. Plaintiffs' Motion for Entry of Partial Final Judgment on Liability as Sanctions for Spoliation of Evidence 66 is granted in part and denied in part as set forth in this Order. As set forth in this Order, Plaintiffs must file any reasonable request for att orneys' fees before February 6, 2012. That the Clerk of the Court shall strike Plaintiffs' Response to Vazirani Defendants' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings (Doc. 84) and the Vazirani Defendants Reply Memorandum in Support of Mo tion for Judgment on the Pleadings on Plaintiffs' RICO Cause of Action (Doc. 87). Plaintiffs shall file their Response within fourteen days of the date of this Order. If Plaintiffs do not wish to make changes to their Response, Plaintiffs may re-file their current response. Defendants shall file their Reply within seven days of Plaintiffs' Response; Denying 73 Defendant Regan's Motion for Sanctions for Discovery Abuse. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 1/10/12.(DMT) *Modified to add additional text as to ruling on motions on 1/10/2012 (DMT).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aviva USA Corporation et al v. Vazirani et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aviva USA Corporation
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Schoonover
Represented By: Andrew Foster Halaby
Represented By: David Gary Barker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aviva Brands Limited
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Schoonover
Represented By: Andrew Foster Halaby
Represented By: David Gary Barker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anil Vazirani
Represented By: Timothy J Thomason
Represented By: David Geoffrey Bray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vazirani & Associates Financial LLC
Represented By: Timothy J Thomason
Represented By: David Geoffrey Bray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secured Financial Solutions LLC
Represented By: David Geoffrey Bray
Represented By: Timothy J Thomason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Vazirani & Associates Financial LLC
Represented By: David Geoffrey Bray
Represented By: Timothy J Thomason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Anil Vazirani
Represented By: David Geoffrey Bray
Represented By: Timothy J Thomason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Secured Financial Solutions LLC
Represented By: David Geoffrey Bray
Represented By: Timothy J Thomason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Aviva Brands Limited
Represented By: David Gary Barker
Represented By: Andrew Foster Halaby
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Schoonover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Aviva USA Corporation
Represented By: David Gary Barker
Represented By: Andrew Foster Halaby
Represented By: Matthew Thomas Schoonover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?