Gregory v. Arizona Department of Child Support Enforcement et al

Plaintiff: Donald Jay Gregory
Defendant: Melanie A Gregory, Arizona Department of Child Support Enforcement and Veronica Hart Ragland
Case Number: 2:2011cv00372
Filed: February 25, 2011
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 27, 2013 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER State Defendants' motion for summary judgment (Doc. 45 ) is granted. The Clerk of the Court is directed to terminate this action. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 6/27/2013.(KMG)
May 2, 2012 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Defendants' motion to dismiss the compliant (Doc. 27 ) is granted in part and denied in part as set forth in this order. Defendants' motion for an order directing Plaintiff to cease any attempts to contact or communicate directly with State Defendants (Doc. 28 ) is granted as set forth in this order. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 5/2/2012.(KMG)
December 13, 2011 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER The 20 motion to set aside default is granted with respect to Defendant Ragland. Plaintiff's 18 motion for default judgment and judgment is denied. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 12/14/11. (ESL)
July 27, 2011 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Defendant's 15 Motion to Dismiss is granted as stated. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 07/27/11. (NOTE: see attached pdf for complete details) (ESL)
May 10, 2011 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Defendants' motions (Docs. 7 , 8 ) are granted. Plaintiff may file an amended complaint by 06/10/11. The Clerk shall terminate this action, with no further leave of Court, if no amended complaint is filed on or before 06/10/11. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 05/10/11. (ESL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gregory v. Arizona Department of Child Support Enforcement et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melanie A Gregory
Represented By: Joseph Robert Hinrichsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arizona Department of Child Support Enforcement
Represented By: James B Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Veronica Hart Ragland
Represented By: James B Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Jay Gregory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?