United States of America v. Business Recovery Services LLC et al

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Business Recovery Services LLC and Brian Hessler
Case Number: 2:2011cv00390
Filed: March 1, 2011
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: James A Teilborg
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:0045
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 6, 2013 206 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Plaintiff's renewed motion for discovery 191 is denied; Plaintiff's motion to strike the answer of Defendant Business Recovery Service LLC ("BRS") 199 is granted; the amended answer of BRS 176 is stricken (this Order does not affect the answer of Brian Hessler, which is also part of Doc. 176); Plaintiff may move for entry of default against BRS within 60 days; Plaintiff may move for default judgment against BRS within 90 days; Plaintiff's motion to exceed pa ge limit 204 is granted; the Clerk Court shall file the Motion for Summary Judgment and Exhibits found at Doc. 204, attachments 2-14; Mr Hessler must update his address with the Court by 4/5/13; Mr Hessler shall also respond to the Government' s motion for summary judgment by 4/5/13; if Mr Hessler fails to do both of these things, the Government may move to strike his answer for failing to comply with a Court order; if the Government so moves, the Government may also include Mr Hessler per sonally in their motions for entry of default and default judgment; granting the motion to submit certain exhibits nonelectronically 205 ; Plaintiff shall deliver these exhibits (if it has not already done so) to the Clerk within 14 days; within 30 days, Plaintiff shall also file a transcript of all recordings (Plaintiff shall file this as an additional attachment to their motion for summary judgment); the Government shall send a copy of this Order to Mr Hessler.Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 3/6/13. (REW)
July 26, 2012 183 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Plaintiff's 160 Motion for Entry of Judgment as unnecessary. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 7/26/12.(REW)
July 16, 2012 182 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Defendants' 167 Motion to Modify Temporary Injunction. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 7/16/12.(REW)
April 10, 2012 161 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 142 Motion to Dismiss; denying as moot 156 Motion for Leave to File Surreply. FURTHER ORDERED vacating the oral argument currently set for 11:00 am. on April 23, 2012. See order for full details. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 4/10/12.(SJF)
March 8, 2012 155 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Plaintiff United States of America's 124 Motion for Attorney Fees in the amount of $33,064.87. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 3/8/12.(REW)
October 17, 2011 118 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: ORDERED DENYING Defendants' Amended Motion for New Trial and for Opinion Regarding Proposed Conduct (Doc. 38 ). FURTHER ORDERED DENYING Defendants' Motion to Prohibit Website Postings of Pleadings and Orders (Doc. 75 ). FURTHE R ORDERED DENYING Defendants' Motion to Dissolve or, Alternately, Modify Preliminary Injunction (Doc. 83 ). FURTHER ORDERED DENYING Defendants' Motion to Appoint a Master (Doc. 86 ). (Note: Doc. 116 is stricken by this Order). Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 10/17/11. (SJF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Business Recovery Services LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Jessica R Gunder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Business Recovery Services LLC
Represented By: Michael E St George
Represented By: Glynn W Gilcrease
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Hessler
Represented By: Glynn W Gilcrease
Represented By: Michael E St George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?