Mitchell v. United States of America

Petitioner: Devon Mitchell
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2011cv00580
Filed: March 28, 2011
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Referring Judge: Mark E Aspey (PS)
Nature of Suit: Motions to Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 26, 2013 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 22 motion to deem Rule 60(b) motion as timely filed. Petitioner shall file no further motions in this action. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 7/26/2013.(TCA)
May 29, 2013 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERm Petitioner Devon Mitchell's motion for an extension of time to file an out of time appeal 20 is denied; Petitioner's request to stay his Rule 60(b) motion is denied as moot. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 5/29/13.(REW)
May 17, 2012 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. The factual findings and conclusions in Judge Aspey's Report and Recommendation (Doc. 11) are accepted. The Clerk shall terminate this action. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 5/16/12. (LFIG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mitchell v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Devon Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: Charles Fred Hyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?