Silving et al v. Wells Fargo Bank NA et al

Plaintiff: Marcus Silving and Deborah Bader
Defendant: First American Title Insurance Company, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Incorporated, Unknown Parties, U.S. Bank NA and Wells Fargo Bank NA
Case Number: 2:2011cv00676
Filed: April 6, 2011
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1444
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 9, 2012 83 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 75 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 3/9/2012.(NVO)
January 18, 2012 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 51 Motion to Dismiss. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate this action. (See document for further details). Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 1/18/12.(LAD)
July 7, 2011 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: 1. Plaintiffs' motion to remand (Doc. 20) is denied.2. Plaintiffs' motion for summary disposition (Doc. 31) is denied. 3. Defendants' motion to dismiss (Doc. 10) is granted in part and denied inpart as stated abo ve. 4. Defendants' motion to quash the lis pendens (Doc. 10) is denied. 5. Plaintiffs shall file an amended complaint within 20 days of this order. 6. The Court will set a case management conference by separate order. 7. The parties should address briefing of the preliminary injunction motion in their Rule 26(f) report and at the case management conference. (See document for further details). Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 7/6/11.(LAD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Silving et al v. Wells Fargo Bank NA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First American Title Insurance Company
Represented By: Matthew David Bedwell
Represented By: Adam Lee Wilkes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Incorporated
Represented By: Daniel W Huitink
Represented By: Gregory James Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank NA
Represented By: Gregory James Marshall
Represented By: Daniel W Huitink
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank NA
Represented By: Gregory James Marshall
Represented By: Daniel W Huitink
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcus Silving
Represented By: Barbara Janet Forde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Bader
Represented By: Barbara Janet Forde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?