Proctor v. Corrections Corporation of America et al

Plaintiff: Bradley D Proctor
Defendant: Lois Miracle, Unknown Parties, Corrections Corporation of America, William Crane and Virginia Cox
Case Number: 2:2011cv00754
Filed: April 14, 2011
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Referring Judge: David K Duncan (PS)
Presiding Judge: Robert C Broomfield
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 31, 2013 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER the reference to the Magistrate Judge is withdrawn as to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss 51 . Defendants' Motion to Dismiss 51 is granted as to the Eighth Amendment claim, which is dismissed without prejudice; the remaining claims are also dismissed without prejudice. Pending motions are denied as moot re 62 . The action is terminated, and the Clerk of Court must enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 1/31/13.(TLJ)
June 4, 2012 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 38 Motion Seeking Clarification of the Record, Order to Remand and Reconsideration. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 6/4/12.(DMT)
February 13, 2012 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (Service Packet), All claims against Defendants CCA, DeLash, Florez, and Alfano, and John or Jane Does are dismissed without prejudice. The claim of intentional infliction of emotional distress against Defendants Cox, Crane and Miracle is dismissed without prejudice. The breach of contract claim against Defendants Cox, Crane and Miracle is dismissed with prejudice. Defendants Cox, Crane, and Miracle must answer the claims in the First Amended Complaint as to the section 1983 claim ba sed upon deliberate indifference, and the closely related state law negligence and medical malpractice claims. The Clerk of Court must send Plaintiff a service packet including the First Amended Complaint (Doc. 33), this Order, and both summons and request for waiver forms for Defendants Cox, Crane, and Miracle. Plaintiff must complete and return the service packet to the Clerk of Court within 21 days of the date of filing of this Order. This matter is referred to Magistrate Judge David K. Duncan for all pretrial proceedings as authorized under 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1). Signed by Judge Robert C Broomfield on 2/10/12. (DMT) Modified to add text on 2/13/2012 (DMT).
June 13, 2011 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (Service Packet) Defendant CCA's motion to substitute counsel is granted. (Doc. 18.) Plaintiff's amended motion for extension of time to seek remand is denied. (Doc. 20.) Defendants CCA, DeLash, Florez, and Alfano, and John or Jane Do es are dismissed without prejudice. Defendants Cox, Crane, and Miracle must answer the Complaint. The Clerk of Court must send Plaintiff a service packet including the Complaint (Doc. 12-4), this Order, and both summons and request for waiver forms f or Defendants Cox, Crane, and Miracle. Plaintiff must complete and return the service packet to the Clerk of Court within 21 days of the date of filing of this Order. This matter is referred to Magistrate Judge David K. Duncan pursuant to Rules 72.1 and 72.2 of the Local Rules of Civil Procedure for all pretrial proceedings as authorized under 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1). Signed by Judge Robert C Broomfield on 6/13/11. (KMG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Proctor v. Corrections Corporation of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bradley D Proctor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lois Miracle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corrections Corporation of America
Represented By: Michele Molinario
Represented By: Daniel T Quinn
Represented By: Daniel Patrick Struck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Crane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Virginia Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?