Velazquez v. United States of America

Petitioner: Matias Velazquez
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2011cv00820
Filed: March 31, 2011
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Yuma
Presiding Judge: Robert C Broomfield
Referring Judge: Mark E Aspey
Nature of Suit: Motions to Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 17, 2014 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, rejecting the 18 Amended Report and Recommendation; petitioner Matias Velazquez' Motion to Vacate Plea of Guilty & Set Aside Judg[]ment/Motion for Expungement 1 is denied, terminating this case; the Clerk shall enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Senior Judge Stephen M McNamee on 6/16/14. (REW)
April 10, 2013 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER That the the Movant, Matias Velazquez, shall have twenty (20) days from the date of entry of this order in which to file and serve a memorandum of law addressing the impact of Chaidez v. U.S., ___ U.S. ___, 133 S.Ct. 1103 (Feb. 20, 2013), if a ny, upon the pending R & R and the United States' objections thereto: FURTHER ORDERED a Response, shall be filed and served in accordance with LRCiv 7.2 FURTHER ORDERED a Reply, if any, shall be filed and served in accordance with LRCiv 7.2(d). Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 4/10/13. (cc: All Cnsl) (MAP)
April 25, 2011 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 1 Motion to Vacate, that the United States of America shall file and serve a response to defendant/petitioner's (Doc 27 in CR97-361-PHX-RCB) Motion to Vacate Plea of Guilty & Set Aside Judgment by no later than Wednesday, 04/27/11. A reply, if any, shall be filed and served and in all ways comply with the Rules of Practice of the United States District Court for the District Court of Arizona. Signed by Judge Robert C Broomfield on 04/21/11. (NOTE: document initially filed in related CR97-361-PHX-RCB as Doc. 29))(ESL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Velazquez v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Matias Velazquez
Represented By: Mark John Berardoni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: James Richard Knapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?