Rexroat v. Arizona Department of Education et al

Plaintiff: Tracy Rexroat
Defendant: Arizona Department of Education and Arizona State Board of Education
Case Number: 2:2011cv01028
Filed: May 24, 2011
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Paul G Rosenblatt
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 8, 2013 114 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 82 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 84 Motion for Summary Judgment. The clerk shall enter judgment accordingly. ORDERED granting 111 Motion to Strike. (See document for full details). Signed by Senior Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 1/7/13.(LAD)
November 26, 2012 108 Opinion or Order of the Court *ORDER denying Plaintiff's 89 Motion to Disqualify Counsel due to Suborning Perjury of a Witness. FURTHER ORDERED denying Plaintiff's 94 Motion to Strike Materially False Declarations of Janet Brite and Debbie Jackson and to Hold Janet Brite, Debbie Jackson and Attorney Balcazo in Contempt of Court. Signed by Senior Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 11/26/2012.(LFIG) *Modified document type to opinion on 11/27/2012 (SSU).
September 17, 2012 88 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 60 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel. Signed by Senior Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 9/17/12.(LSP)
November 22, 2011 27 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER that Defendants' 15 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings is granted. Plaintiff's Title VII and ACRA claims are dismissed with prejudice. All claims against the State Board of Education are dismissed with prejudice; Plaintiff's 20 Motion to Correct the Docket is denied. It is further ordered that pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 54(b), the Clerk of Court shall enter judgment. Signed by Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 11/22/11. (ESL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rexroat v. Arizona Department of Education et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy Rexroat
Represented By: Cameron Matthew Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arizona Department of Education
Represented By: Rachel M Bacalzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arizona State Board of Education
Represented By: Rachel M Bacalzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?