Perez v. Bell et al

Plaintiff: Sergio Amaro Perez
Defendant: Unknown Bell and Unknown Park
Case Number: 2:2011cv01068
Filed: May 27, 2011
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Pinal
Presiding Judge: Robert C Broomfield
Referring Judge: Mark E Aspey (PS)
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 1, 2012 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 15 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and the Clerk shall enter judgment of dismissal. For the reasons set forth herein, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3), an appeal from the judgment in this action would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 5/1/12.(LSP)
September 28, 2011 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (Service Packet), Defendant City of Mesa Police Department is dismissed without prejudice and Defendants Bell and Park must answer Count I (Doc. 9 ). The Clerk of Court must send Plaintiff a service packet including the First Amended Complain t (Doc. 9), this Order, and both summons and request for waiver forms for Defendants Bell and Park. Plaintiff must complete and return the service packet to the Clerk of Court within 21 days of the date of filing of this Order. This matter is referred to Magistrate Judge Mark E. Aspey. Signed by Judge Robert C Broomfield on 9/28/11. (See attached PDF for complete information.)(KAH)
July 6, 2011 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made from Prison Account of Sergio Amaro Perez. Signed by Judge Robert C Broomfield on 7/6/11. (LSP)
June 13, 2011 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 3 Plaintiff's Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Within 30 days of the date this Order is filed, Plaintiff must either pay the $350.00 filing fee or file a completed Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Clerk must enter dismissal without prejudice if Plaintiff fails to comply. Signed by Judge Robert C Broomfield on 6/13/11.(LSP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perez v. Bell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sergio Amaro Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?