Osuna v. BAC Home Loans Servicing LP et al

Plaintiff: Oscar Osuna
Defendant: BAC Home Loans Servicing LP, ReconTrust Company NA and Unknown Parties
Case Number: 2:2011cv01147
Filed: June 7, 2011
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Pinal
Presiding Judge: G Murray Snow
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 15, 2012 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the 24 Motion to Dismiss without Prejudice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the 23 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED AS MOOT. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate this action. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 10/15/2012.(LFIG)
January 3, 2012 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 10 Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 1/3/12.(LSP)
December 13, 2011 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 6 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Counts One, Two, Three and Five are dismissed. The only remaining count in this action is Count Four. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 12/12/11.(DMT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Osuna v. BAC Home Loans Servicing LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAC Home Loans Servicing LP
Represented By: Sean Keenan McElenney
Represented By: Gregory Bryan Iannelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ReconTrust Company NA
Represented By: Gregory Bryan Iannelli
Represented By: Sean Keenan McElenney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oscar Osuna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?