Eagle v. Bill Alexander Automotive Center Incorporated

Plaintiff: James Eagle
Defendant: Bill Alexander Automotive Center Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2011cv01148
Filed: June 7, 2011
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: James A Teilborg
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 29:621
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 17, 2013 105 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 81 Defendant's Motion to Strike and granting 64 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. The Clerk shall enter judgment in favor of Defendant and against Plaintiff. The Clerk shall close this case. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 9/17/13.(LSP)
August 8, 2013 99 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 60 Motion to Seal FURTHER ORDERED granting 67 Motion for Protective Order. The protective terms in the motion shall be enforced in thismatter. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 8/7/13.(MAP)
June 5, 2012 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 21 Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. The Court enters judgment for Defendant on Plaintiff's ADEA claim for hostile work environment to the extent Plaintiff attempted to allege a separate claim for harassmen t/hostile work environment under the ADEA. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED denying Defendant's request to strike certain paragraphs from the Complaint and denying without prejudice Defendant's request for attorneys' fees. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 6/5/12.(LSP)
March 1, 2012 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 34 Defendant's Motion for Leave to Amend Answer. Defendant shall file its Second Amended Answer within 10 days of this Order. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 3/1/12.(LSP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eagle v. Bill Alexander Automotive Center Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Eagle
Represented By: Stephen G Montoya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Alexander Automotive Center Incorporated
Represented By: Michael Frederick Edgell
Represented By: Karen L Karr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?