Vertin v. Goddard et al

Plaintiff: Ronald L Vertin
Defendant: Jennifer Pinniow, Arizona, State of, Terry L Goddard, Katrin M Nelson, Charles Johnson, J W Smith and Avondale, City of
Case Number: 2:2011cv01167
Filed: June 13, 2011
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: G Murray Snow
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 2, 2013 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Defendant City of Avondale's 35 Motion for Summary Judgment and 47 Supplemental Motion for Summary Judgment are granted. ORDERED that Defendant State of Arizona's 36 Motion for Summary Judgment and 45 Supplemental Motion for Summary Judgment are granted. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate this action and enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 12/2/2013.(LFIG)
May 8, 2013 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiff Ronald L. Vertin's claim be reinstated as to Jennifer Pinnow, City of Avondale, and the State of Arizona. ORDERED directing the Clerk of Court to strike Vertin's 26 First Amended Complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Vertin shall have fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order to move for leave to file a (third) amended complaint. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 5/8/2013. (LFIG)
October 27, 2011 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Plaintiff to show good cause why this matter should not be terminated for failure to serve Defendants within the time required and why the Court should not strike 4 Second Amended Complaint for failure to comply with Rule 15 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Arizona Local Rule 15.1, within 14 days of the date of this Order. The Clerk shall dismiss this action without prejudice if Plaintiff fails to comply. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 10/27/11. (LSP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vertin v. Goddard et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Pinniow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arizona, State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry L Goddard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katrin M Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J W Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avondale, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald L Vertin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?