Federal National Mortgage Association v. Home et al

Plaintiff: Federal National Mortgage Association
Defendant: Marshall E Home and Independent Rights Party
Case Number: 2:2011cv01227
Filed: June 22, 2011
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Pima
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Property Damage
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 23, 2012 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Defendant Marshal Home's 59 Rebuttal to Prima Facie and Motion to Dismiss is denied. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 5/23/12. (LFIG)
April 5, 2012 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 50 Entry of Default, Final Judgment, and Permanent Injunction Order, 52 Order (granting attorneys' fees and in the amount of $70,192.50 and costs in the amount of $1,219.00), and 53 Notice of Lodging of Form of Judgment (with attached form of judgment); if Defendant wishes to seek relief from these orders, he shall do so on or before May 4, 2012. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 4/5/12. (LSP)
March 6, 2012 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the Court directs the clerk to change defendant's address to: Marshall E. Home #56200-008 CCA-FCC P.O. Box 6200 Florence, Arizona 85123-6200. If Defendant wishes to comment on this notice, he shall do so in writing on or before March 23, 2012. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 3/6/12. (LSP)
January 3, 2012 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 51 Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney Fees. Plaintiff is awarded attorneys' fees in the amount of $70,192.50 and costs in the amount of $1,219.00. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 1/3/12.(LSP)
August 25, 2011 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 44 Fannie Mae's Motion for Entry of Default. Defendants shall have until 9/9/11 to respond to the motion for final judgment and permanent injunction 44 . Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 8/25/11.(TLJ)
July 1, 2011 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION: Pursuant to the stipulation between Fannie Mae and Defendant Marshall Home, as stated on the record at the hearing, and the absence of opposition by IRP, Fannie Mae's motion (Doc. 4) is treated as one for a prel iminary injunction. For reasons stated above and on the record, the motion is granted. This order and preliminary injunction is conditioned upon Fannie Mae posting a security bond in the amount of $5,000.00 by July 6, 2011. This security bond sh all serve as security for payment of such costs and damages as may be incurred or suffered by Defendants if they are later found to have been wrongfully enjoined and restrained. Fannie Mae, by July 6, 2011, shall provide notice and file a copy of thi s order and preliminary injunction to the Maricopa County Recorders Office, the Pima County Recorder's Office, and the Arizona Secretary of State. The motion to dismiss (Doc. 33) is denied.The Court will set a case management conference by separate order. (See document for further details). Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 7/1/11.(LAD)
June 29, 2011 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 32 Plaintiff's Motion to Substitute Attorney, adding Attorneys Mark A Nadeau, Cynthia Ann Ricketts, and Allison Leigh Kierman and terminating Attorneys Douglas A. Toleno, Laurel I. Handley, and Allison C. Lienau for Federal National Mortgage Association. Plaintiff's new counsel shall appear at the 6/30/2011 motion hearing. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 6/29/11.(LSP)
June 23, 2011 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - Plaintiff's ex parte motion for temporary restraining order (Doc. 4) is denied in part to the extent it seeks ex parte relief. A hearing on the motion is set for June 30, 2011 at 1:00 p.m. in Courtroom 603, Sandra Day O'Connor U.S. Federal Courthouse, 401 W. Washington St., Phoenix, Arizona 85003-2151. Plaintiff promptly shall provide Defendants with oral notice of the hearing and copies of the complaint, the motion for TRO, and this order. (See document for full details). Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 6/23/11. (LAD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Federal National Mortgage Association v. Home et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Federal National Mortgage Association
Represented By: Allison Leigh Kierman
Represented By: Mark A Nadeau
Represented By: Cynthia Ann Ricketts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marshall E Home
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Independent Rights Party
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?