Seawright v. Arizona, State of et al

Plaintiff: Kini M Seawright
Defendant: Brady Harvey, Unknown Parties, Arizona, State of, Arizona Department of Corrections, Charles L Ryan, William R White, Clayton Thompson, Jennifer Blondin, Edna Jackson-Bey, Vincent Hartley, Laura Chavez and Unknown Scott
Case Number: 2:2011cv01304
Filed: June 30, 2011
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: James A Teilborg
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 4, 2013 119 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 83 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment; denying as moot 95 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limit. ORDER that the Clerk of the Court shall enter Judgment in favor of Defendants and against Plaintiffs, with Plaintiffs to take nothing. ORDER that the Clerk of the Court shall close this case. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 9/4/13.(TLJ)
August 16, 2013 115 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 94 Plaintiffs' Rule 60(B)(1) Motion to Set Aside. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 8/16/13.(TLB)
March 1, 2013 85 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 79 Motion to Seal. The Clerk of the Court shall file under seal the attachments to exhibits lodged at (Doc. 81). Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 3/1/13.(MAP)
February 6, 2013 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 63 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Specifically, the Court denies Defendants' motion to dismiss all § 1983 claims against all Defendants because no personal representative for the Estate has been appointed. The Court grants Defendants' motion to dismiss Count One and Count Two against Defendant Charles L. Ryan. The Court denies Defendants' motion to dismiss the Estate's § 1983 claims for pain and suffering. The Cou rt grants Defendants' motion to dismiss Kini Seawright's § 1983 claims for pain and suffering. The Court grants Defendants' motion to dismiss the Estate's claim for tort and statutory damages. Finally, the Court grants Defendants' motion to dismiss punitive damages against the State of Arizona on Counts Three, Four, and Five. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 2/6/13.(DMT)
June 13, 2012 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 35 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave File a Second Amended Complaint. The motion is granted to the limited extent outlined above and denied in all other respects. Plaintiff shall file the Second Amended Complaint within five days of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 6/13/12.(DMT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Seawright v. Arizona, State of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brady Harvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arizona, State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arizona Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles L Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William R White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clayton Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Blondin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edna Jackson-Bey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vincent Hartley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura Chavez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kini M Seawright
Represented By: DeeAn Gillespie
Represented By: Amy J Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?