Reed v. Barcklay et al

Plaintiff: Kenneth W Reed
Defendant: Karen Barcklay, Charles L Ryan and Dennis G Chenail
Case Number: 2:2011cv01339
Filed: July 6, 2011
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Yuma
Referring Judge: Jay R Irwin (PS)
Presiding Judge: James A Teilborg
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 17, 2014 364 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Injunction Claim, (Doc. 346 ), is granted with respect to Plaintiff's request for injunctive relief in Count I of the Complaint, (Doc. 22 ). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED den ying 359 Defendant's Motion to Supplement Defendant's Statement of Facts in Support of Her Motion for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Injunction Claim and denying 354 Plaintiff's Motion to Preclude/Strike Declaration of Dr. Arnold; Alternatively for Leave to Depose Dr. Arnold and Provide a Rebuttal Expert. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 12/17/14.(LSP)
December 11, 2013 308 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - ORDERED that Plaintiffs motion to supplement is granted in part and denied in part (Doc. 291 ). Plaintiffs request to file a supplemental complaint to add new causes of action is denied. The Clerk of the Court shall not file the Supplementa l Complaint lodged at Doc. 292 . Plaintiffs request to supplement Count I is granted. Plaintiff may, within 14 days, submit a supplement to the First Amended complaint (this will only be a supplement to the First Amended complaint and will not supe rsede the First Amended complaint). This supplement shall include any additional facts (but not legal causes of action) Plaintiff intends to argue support his injunction request. Within 21 day, Plaintiff shall supplement his disclosure statements, if necessary. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs motion to clarify (Doc. 297 ) is granted as follows: the parties shall prepare a joint list of witnesses and file it with the Court contemporaneous to filing all other documents required by the Order Sett ing Final Pretrial Conference (Doc. 290 ). FINALLY ORDERED that, due to this Order, the deadline for filing the joint proposed final pretrial order and all related documents is extended to January 10, 2014. The deadline for filing motions in limine related ONLY to issues arising from the supplement to the First Amended complaint is extended to January 10, 2014. The deadline for responding to those motions in limine is extend to January 24, 2014. (Responses to the Motions in Limine already filed remain due January 6, 2014.) (See attached Order for details). Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 12/11/2013.(TLB)
September 27, 2013 285 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff's Objections to Magistrate Judge's Order of September 12, 2013 280 are overruled [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 9/27/13. (MAW)
July 9, 2013 255 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion to Recuse Magistrate Judge and Objections to the Magistrate Judge's Orders of December 27, 2012 and January 25, 2013 (Doc. 213 and 214 ) is denied and the objections are overruled. IT IS FU RTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's Supplement to his Motion to Recuse and Objections to the Magistrate Judge's Order of February 5, 2013 (Doc. 215 ) is denied and the objections are overruled. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's Objec tions to Magistrate Judge's Order of April 30, 2013 (Doc. 245 and Doc. 246 ) are overruled. The Magistrate Judge's Orders of December 27, 2012 (Doc. 191 ), February 5, 2013(Doc. 209 ), and January 25, 2013 Order (Doc. 202 ), and April 30, 2013 Order (Doc. 235 ) are affirmed. (See document for full details). Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 7/9/13. (LAD)
October 24, 2012 149 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the reference to the Magistrate Judge is withdrawn as to Plaintiffs combined motion (Doc. 58); and denying 58 Motion for TRO; denying 58 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; denying 58 Motion for Emergency Hearing. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 10/24/12.(DMT)
July 19, 2012 107 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER affirming 100 Magistrate Judge Metcalf's Order of June 22, 2012 and denying 106 Plaintiff's Objection to Magistrate Judge's Order Dated June 22, 2012. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 7/19/12. (LSP)
June 26, 2012 103 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER affirming the Magistrate Judge's Orders of February 6, 2012 (Doc. 36), March 26, 2012 (Doc. 46), and April 13, 2012 (Doc. 55). Denying 37 Plaintiff's Motion to overrule the Magistrate ruling. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 6/25/12.(DMT)
August 31, 2011 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiff's Motion for Remand of Cause to State Court 13 is denied. Plaintiff's Objection to Judicial Assignment and Request for Recusal 14 is denied. Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration 16 is denied. Plaintiff� 39;s Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Amended Complaint 15 is granted. Plaintiff has 30 days from the date this Order is filed to file an amended complaint in compliance with this Order. If Plaintiff fails to file an amended complaint within 30 days, the Clerk of Court must, without further notice, enter a judgment of dismissal of this action without prejudice. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 8/30/11.(DMT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reed v. Barcklay et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth W Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Barcklay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles L Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis G Chenail
Represented By: Paul Edward Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?