Bertanelli v. Ryan et al

Plaintiff: Jonathan Cataldo Bertanelli
Defendant: Unknown Parties, Charles L Ryan, Keith Hartsuck and Unknown Abelowiz
Case Number: 2:2011cv01346
Filed: July 6, 2011
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Referring Judge: Lawrence O Anderson (PS)
Presiding Judge: Paul G Rosenblatt
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 1, 2012 85 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Plaintiff's 63 and 70 Objections. Signed by Senior Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 10/1/2012.(LFIG)
July 17, 2012 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 52 "Objection to Magistrate Order Denying (Count II) of Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint." Signed by Senior Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 7/17/12.(LAD)
May 22, 2012 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File a First Amended Complaint, doc. 36, is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Clerk of Court is directed to filed the First Amended Complaint attached to Plaintiff's Motion for Le ave to File a First Amended Complaint, doc. 36 - attachment. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion in Opposition to Court's Anticipated Screening Order, doc. 37, is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants' Motion to Dismi ss, doc. 34, and Plaintiff's Motion for Order Not to Respond to Motion to Dismiss, doc. 38, are DENIED as moot in view of the filing of the First Amended Complaint. (See document for further details). Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 5/22/12.(LAD)
February 13, 2012 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Court Order to File Delayed Preliminary Injunction Appeal (Doc. 22) is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for "Stay of Ruling" on Plaintiff's Motion Re Amended Complaint During Pendency of Plaintiff's Motion for Filing Delayed Preliminary Injunction Appeal Ruling (Doc. 24) is DENIED as moot. (See document for further details). Signed by Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 2/13/12.(LAD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bertanelli v. Ryan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles L Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Hartsuck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Abelowiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Cataldo Bertanelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?