Bronick v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company et al

Plaintiff: Sandra Bronick
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company and Unknown Parties
Case Number: 2:2011cv01442
Filed: July 20, 2011
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: James A Teilborg
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 15, 2013 93 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 65 Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's bad faith claim. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 7/15/2013.(TLB)
July 11, 2013 88 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER regarding Plaintiff's Motion to Recuse the Hon. James A. Teilborg Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 144 and 28 U.S.C. § 455 (Doc. 76 ). ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion to Recuse the Honorable James A. Teilborg Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 144 and 28 U.S.C. § 455 (Doc. 76) is denied. See order for details. Signed by Judge Neil V. Wake on 7-11-13. (NVW, nb)
May 30, 2013 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the Plaintiff's Motion to Recuse the Honorable James A. Teilborg Pursuant to 28 U.S.C.A. § 144 (Doc. 76 ) is reassigned to the Honorable Neil V. Wake United States District Judge. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 5/29/2013. (KMG)
November 17, 2011 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 9 Motion to Remand to State Court. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 11/17/11.(MAP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bronick v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael R Altaffer
Represented By: Heather Patricia Arias
Represented By: Daniel Campbell, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Bronick
Represented By: Matthew Lamont Riggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?