Spain v. Sundt Construction Incorporated

Plaintiff: Stephanie Spain
Defendant: Sundt Construction Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2011cv01617
Filed: August 18, 2011
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Lawrence O Anderson
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 21, 2012 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Defendant's 44 Motion to Compel Mental Independent Medical Examination of Plaintiff is granted. ORDERED that Plaintiff shall appear for an independent medical mental examination on December 18, 2012 at 8:00 a.m. at Steven Pitt & Associates, 15849 North 71st Street, Suite 100 Scottsdale, AZ 85254-2179. No third parties will be permitted to sit in during the examination. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 11/21/2012.(LFIG)
January 30, 2012 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 9 Plaintiff's Motion for Relief from Judgment and Order. ORDER that the Judgment entered 10/13/11 7 is vacated. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 1/30/12.(TLJ)
October 13, 2011 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED DISMISSING Plaintiff's Complaint without prejudice. The Clerk is kindly directed to terminate this case. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 10/13/11. (LAD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spain v. Sundt Construction Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sundt Construction Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Spain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?