Delacruz v. Ryan et al

Plaintiff: Juan F Delacruz
Defendant: Charles L Ryan, Unknown Bellcord, Unknown Chapagne, Unknown Zabczak, Unknown Party, Dennis R Kendall and Unknown Faibisoff
Case Number: 2:2011cv01745
Filed: September 2, 2011
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Pinal
Referring Judge: Mark E Aspey (PS)
Presiding Judge: G Murray Snow
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 19, 2013 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER the reference to the Magistrate Judge is withdrawn as to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment 30 ; granting 30 Defenant's Motion for Summary Judgment. The action is terminated, and the Clerk of Court must enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 3/19/13.(TLJ)
January 13, 2012 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (Service Packet): The Clerk of Court must send Plaintiff a service packet including the First Amended Complaint (Doc. 9), this Order, and both summons and request for waiver forms for Defendant Ryan. This matter is referred to Magistrate Judge Mark E. Aspey pursuant to Rules 72.1 and 72.2 of the Local Rules of Civil Procedure for all pretrial proceedings as authorizedunder 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1). Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 1/13/12. (LAD)
November 29, 2011 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Within 30 days of the date this Order is filed, Plaintiff must file a completed and signed Certificate, using the Certificate form provided with this Order, certifying that Plaintiff's signature on the Certificate shall serve as an origina l signature on his Amended Complaint for the purposes Rule 3.4(a) of the Local Rules of Civil Procedure and Rule 11 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. If Plaintiff fails to comply, the Clerk of Court must strike Plaintiff's Amended Complaint and enter a judgment of dismissal of this action without prejudice and without further notice to Plaintiff. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 11/29/11. (ESL)
October 12, 2011 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Complaint (Doc. 1) is dismissed for failure to comply with Rules 8 and 10 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Plaintiff has 30 days from the date this Order is filed to fi le a first amended complaint in compliance with this Order. If Plaintiff fails to file an amended complaint within 30 days, the Clerk of Court must, without further notice, enter a judgment of dismissal of this action without prejudice. (See document for full details. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 10/11/11.(LAD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Delacruz v. Ryan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan F Delacruz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles L Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Bellcord
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Chapagne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Zabczak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Party
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis R Kendall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Faibisoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?