Quanta Indemnity Company v. Amberwood Development Incorporated, et al

Plaintiff: Quanta Indemnity Company
Defendant: Summerset Marketing Enterprises Incorporated, Unknown Parties, Amberwood Homes LLC, Roll Tide LLP and Amberwood Development Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2011cv01807
Filed: September 15, 2011
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: G Murray Snow
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 26, 2014 194 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 138 Quanta Indemnity Company's Motion for Summary Judgment; FURTHER ORDERED denying 139 Defendant General Fidelity Insurance Company's Motion for Summary Judgment; FURTHER ORDERED granting in part and denying in part [14 1] North American Specialty's Motion for Summary Judgment. FURTHER ORDERED denying without prejudice Quanta's request for costs and attorneys' fees. See attached Order for details. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 3/26/2014.(TLB)
December 3, 2013 181 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - granting 178 Motion for Expedited Consideration. FURTHER ORDERED denying 177 Motion to Strike without prejudice to raising the same arguments in the replies. FINALLY ORDERED denying 179 Motion for Extension of Time to File Replies. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 12/3/2013.(TLB)
October 23, 2013 155 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the motion to seal (Doc. 148 ) is denied. The Documents Lodged at Docs. 149 and 150 are stricken, but may remain under seal. General Fidelity shall file a response to the motion for summary judgment and controverting statement of facts by November 1, 2013. As indicated above, General Fidelity may not file both documents in their entirety under seal. If General Fidelity believes it can make the particularized showing required by Kamakana to file a particul ar exhibit or a particular fact in the response under seal, General Fidelity may move to file solely those items under seal. If General Fidelity so moves, it shall simultaneously file a redacted, unsealed version of both documents. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the stipulated protective order (Doc. 154 ) is denied, without prejudice. (See document for further details). Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 10/23/13. (LAD)
June 20, 2013 122 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Quanta Indemnity Company and Defendant General Fidelity Insurance Company's 103 Joint Motion for Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice of Coverage Claims re: Gribble and Banovac is granted in part and denied in part as set forth he rein. ORDERED that within 10 days of the date of this Order, Movants shall file a Notice with the Court indicating whether they still seek dismissal of the Banovac claims. If Movants do not file a Notice, the claims relating to Banovac v. Amberwood Development will be dismissed from this case without prejudice without further notice. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 6/20/2013.(LFIG)
July 12, 2012 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 50 Supplement filed by Plaintiff: ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file a second supplement regarding jurisdiction by July 20, 2012 alleging the citizenship of the Johnson Family Trust. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 7/12/12. (SJF)
June 26, 2012 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER striking the 47 second amended complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff must file the supplement required by this Court's order of June 14, 2012, by June 28, 2012. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 6/26/2012. (LFIG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Quanta Indemnity Company v. Amberwood Development Incorporated, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Summerset Marketing Enterprises Incorporated
Represented By: John Patrick Flynn
Represented By: Todd Alan Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amberwood Homes LLC
Represented By: John Patrick Flynn
Represented By: Todd Alan Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roll Tide LLP
Represented By: John Patrick Flynn
Represented By: Todd Alan Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amberwood Development Incorporated
Represented By: Todd Alan Williams
Represented By: John Patrick Flynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quanta Indemnity Company
Represented By: Neil Singh
Represented By: David M Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?