Mastro's Restaurants LLC v. Dominick Group LLC et al

Plaintiff: Mastro's Restaurants LLC
Defendant: DPM Management Incorporated, Dennis Mastro, Michael Mastro, Jeffrey Mastro, Brenda Mastro, Scott Troilo, Dominick Group LLC, Mastro Properties LLC, Mastro Development Company and Dominick's Italian Steakhouse LLC
Case Number: 2:2011cv01996
Filed: October 13, 2011
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Paul G Rosenblatt
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 5, 2012 100 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 56 Motion to Compel. Plaintiff MR shall produce, no later than November 26, 2012, all communications between MR and Defendants relating to the Seventh Amendment to the APA. Signed by Senior Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 11/5/12.(LAD)
June 11, 2012 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 37 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint. (See document for further details). Signed by Senior Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 6/11/12.(LAD)
April 16, 2012 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 56 MOTION to Compel: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties engage in face-to-face or telephone consultation concerning the status of the discovery requests contained in Defendants' Motion to Compel and file a status report on those issues no later than April 27, 2012. The parties shall be prepared to discuss the issues at the May 2, 2012, oral argument. (See document for further details). Signed by Senior Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 4/16/12. (LAD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mastro's Restaurants LLC v. Dominick Group LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DPM Management Incorporated
Represented By: Andrew Mark Federhar
Represented By: Ray Kendall Harris
Represented By: Andrea Lynn Marconi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Mastro
Represented By: Andrew Mark Federhar
Represented By: Ray Kendall Harris
Represented By: Andrea Lynn Marconi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Mastro
Represented By: Andrew Mark Federhar
Represented By: Ray Kendall Harris
Represented By: Andrea Lynn Marconi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Mastro
Represented By: Andrew Mark Federhar
Represented By: Ray Kendall Harris
Represented By: Andrea Lynn Marconi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenda Mastro
Represented By: Andrew Mark Federhar
Represented By: Ray Kendall Harris
Represented By: Andrea Lynn Marconi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Troilo
Represented By: Andrew Mark Federhar
Represented By: Ray Kendall Harris
Represented By: Andrea Lynn Marconi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dominick Group LLC
Represented By: Andrea Lynn Marconi
Represented By: Ray Kendall Harris
Represented By: Andrew Mark Federhar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mastro Properties LLC
Represented By: Andrew Mark Federhar
Represented By: Ray Kendall Harris
Represented By: Andrea Lynn Marconi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mastro Development Company
Represented By: Andrew Mark Federhar
Represented By: Ray Kendall Harris
Represented By: Andrea Lynn Marconi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dominick's Italian Steakhouse LLC
Represented By: Andrea Lynn Marconi
Represented By: Ray Kendall Harris
Represented By: Andrew Mark Federhar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mastro's Restaurants LLC
Represented By: Diana M Torres
Represented By: Claudia Ray
Represented By: Randall Papetti
Represented By: Brendan T Kehoe
Represented By: Sean David Garrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?