Robert Kubicek Architects & Associates Incorporated v. Bosley et al

Plaintiff: Robert Kubicek Architects & Associates Incorporated
Defendant: Bruce C Bosley, Joanne M Bosley, Bosley Group Incorporated and Bashas' Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2011cv02112
Filed: October 27, 2011
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 13, 2013 126 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 102 Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 3/13/2013.(NVO)
December 14, 2012 83 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 63 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 79 Motion to Consolidate Cases. The Court will set a final pretrial conference by separate order. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 12/14/2012.(NVO)
August 1, 2012 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 36 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 8/1/2012.(NVO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robert Kubicek Architects & Associates Incorporated v. Bosley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Kubicek Architects & Associates Incorporated
Represented By: Richard K Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce C Bosley
Represented By: Luane Rosen
Represented By: Charles Donald Onofry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joanne M Bosley
Represented By: Luane Rosen
Represented By: Charles Donald Onofry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bosley Group Incorporated
Represented By: Charles Donald Onofry
Represented By: Luane Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bashas' Incorporated
Represented By: Andrew Abraham
Represented By: Ralph D Harris
Represented By: Michael William McGrath
Represented By: Isaac Daniel Rothschild
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?