Timberman v. Arizona Department of Corrections et al

Plaintiff: Robert Lee Timberman
Defendant: Arizona Department of Corrections, Great Plains Correctional Facility, Charles L Ryan, R Bock and Unknown Parties
Case Number: 2:2012cv00092
Filed: January 13, 2012
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Yuma
Referring Judge: David K Duncan (PS)
Presiding Judge: Robert C Broomfield
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 19, 2012 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Count Three is dismissed without prejudice. Defendants GEO Corporation and Doe Corporation are dismissed without prejudice. Within 30 days of the date of this Order, Plaintiff must file a Response to this Order that includes either (1) the name of at least one of the John Doe Defendants or (2) an explanation of what Plaintiff has done to try to learn their names, a description of what discovery he would undertake to learn their names, and the identity of at least one person who could be s erved with discovery. If Plaintiff fails to file a Response within 30 days, the Clerk of Court must enter a judgment of dismissal of this action without prejudice and without further notice to Plaintiff. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 7/18/12. (KMG)
May 11, 2012 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Plaintiff's Motion for Appointment of Counsel (Doc. 11 ) is denied without prejudice. The Second Amended Complaint (Doc. 12 ) is dismissed for failure to state a claim. Plaintiff has 30 days from the date this Order is filed to file a t hird amended complaint in compliance with this Order. If Plaintiff fails to file a third amended complaint within 30 days, the Clerk of Court must, without further notice, enter a judgment of dismissal of this action with prejudice that states that t he dismissal may count as a "strike" under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g). The Clerk of Court must mail Plaintiff a court-approved form for filing a civil rights complaint by a prisoner. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 5/11/2012. (KMG)
March 16, 2012 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice the 8 Motion for Appointment of Counsel. The First Amended Complaint (Doc. 9) is dismissed for failure to state a claim.Plaintiff has 30 days from the date this Order is filed to file a second amended complaint in compliance with this Order. If Plaintiff fails to file a second amended complaint within 30 days, the Clerk of Court must, without further notice, enter a judgment of dismissal of this action with prejudice that states that the dismissal may count as a "strike" under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g). Signed by Judge Robert C Broomfield on 3/16/12.(LAD)
February 2, 2012 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made from Prison Account of Robert L. Timberman. Signed by Judge Robert C Broomfield on 2/1/2012. (KMG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Timberman v. Arizona Department of Corrections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arizona Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great Plains Correctional Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles L Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R Bock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Lee Timberman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?