United States of America v. $2,164,341.00 in US Currency

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $2,164,341.00 in US Currency
Claimant: Leonardo Cornejo-Reynoso
Case Number: 2:2012cv00105
Filed: January 17, 2012
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 6, 2013 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER The government's motion for summary judgment (Doc. 42 ) is granted. Claimant's interest in $2,164,341 in U.S. Currency is forfeited to the United States. If the government desires a more formal judgment, it shall submit a form of judgment to the Court. The government's motion for judgment of forfeiture (Doc. 44 ) is denied as moot. The Clerk is directed to terminate this action. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 6/6/2013.(KMG)
January 28, 2013 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 34 Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 1/28/2013.(NVO)
October 23, 2012 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 26 Emergency MOTION for Protective Order Regarding Deposition Scheduled for October 23, 2012 filed by Leonardo Cornejo-Reynoso. Claimant shall appear for his deposition on 10/24/2012. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 10/23/2012. (NVO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $2,164,341.00 in US Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Reid Charles Pixler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $2,164,341.00 in US Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Leonardo Cornejo-Reynoso
Represented By: J Blake Mayes
Represented By: David Vincent Telles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?