Gressett v. Central Arizona Water Conservation District

Plaintiff: Aime M Gressett
Defendant: Central Arizona Water Conservation District
Case Number: 2:2012cv00185
Filed: January 26, 2012
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: James A Teilborg
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 31, 2015 177 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 58(a), the Court enters its judgment in a document filed contemporaneously with this Order. ORDERED that plaintiff may move for an award of attorneys' fees in accordance with Local Rule of Civil Procedure 54.2. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff may file a notice of taxable costs in accordance with Local Rule of Civil Procedure 54.1. See attached Order for details. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 3/31/2015. (TLB)
August 14, 2014 109 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 94 Plaintiff Amie Gresset's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; ORDERED denying 96 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment; ORDERED denying 98 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike 111 Extraneous and Unnecessary Statements of Fact and Request for Expedited Consideration. See attached Order for details. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 8/13/2014.(TLB)
July 24, 2012 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 6 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 7/24/12.(TLJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gressett v. Central Arizona Water Conservation District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aime M Gressett
Represented By: Jerry D Krumwiede
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Arizona Water Conservation District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?