Mahuwe v. Petsmart Incorporated

Plaintiff: Roger Mahuwe
Defendant: Petsmart Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2012cv00263
Filed: February 8, 2012
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 12, 2012 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Plaintiff's 21 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 7/12/2012.(KMG)
May 14, 2012 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint by June 1, 2012. Plaintiff is again warned that if he fails to comply with this requirement, the Court will dismiss this case for failure to comply with the Court's orders and for failure to prosecute. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 5/14/2012. (KMG)
April 27, 2012 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Plaintiff has filed a document (Doc. 13 ) that appears to be his response to the Court's order requiring a more definite statement (Doc. 12). The document does not provide a more definite statement and does not comply with the Court' s order of April 9, 2012 (Doc. 12). Plaintiff shall, on or before May 11, 2012, file an amended complaint that complies with and addresses the issues set forth in sections II and III of the Court's order of April 9, 2012 (Doc. 12). Plaintiff is again warned that if he fails to comply with these requirements by May 11, 2012, the Court likely will dismiss this case for failure to comply with the Court's orders and for failure to prosecute. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 4/27/2012. (KMG)
April 9, 2012 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 5 Motion for More Definite Statement. Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint by April 30, 2012. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 4/9/12.(SJF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mahuwe v. Petsmart Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger Mahuwe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Petsmart Incorporated
Represented By: Christie Lynn Kriegsfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?