Bryant et al v. Goodyear, City of et al

Plaintiff: David Bryant and Andrea Bryant
Defendant: Unknown McLaughlin, Jeff Rogers, Unknown Rogers, Goodyear, City of, William R Newman, Jr., Unknown Newman, Mark Brown, Unknown Brown and Ralph McLaughlin
Case Number: 2:2012cv00319
Filed: February 15, 2012
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: James A Teilborg
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 19, 2014 129 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Defendants' 116 Motion for Summary Judgment is granted. ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall enter judgment in favor of Defendants on all claims and terminate this case. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 5/19/2014.(LFIG)
February 21, 2014 123 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 120 Plaintiffs' Motion to Exceed Page Limit. Plaintiffs shall file on or before 2/26/2014 a Response to Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment that complies with the page limit. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 2/21/2014.(TLB)
September 4, 2013 110 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 89 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Counts/Claims. ORDERED that the motion is granted as to Counts 1, 2, 3, 4, 9, 11, 13, 14, 15, 17, 18, 19, 20, 21, 22, 23, 24 and 25 and denied as to Counts 6, 7, 10, 12 and 16. (see attached order for details). Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 9/4/2013.(TLB)
August 7, 2013 108 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 85 MOTION for Reconsideration re 81 Order or alternatively RULE 60(b) MOTION for Relief Reinstating Some State Claims Against Newman, McLaughlin and granting in part and denying in part the 90 MOTION to Stay Discovery an d Dispositive Motion Deadline as follows: Defendants' Motion to Stay this case is denied. IT IS ORDERED amending the Court's Scheduling Order (Doc. 23 ) as follows: IT IS ORDERED that all discovery, including depositions of parties, wi tnesses, and experts, answers to interrogatories, and supplements to interrogatories must be completed by October 30, 2013. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all dispositive motions shall be filed no later than December 6, 2013. Such motions must be, in all respects, in full compliance with the Civil Local Rules. (See document for further details). Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 8/6/13. (LAD)
May 6, 2013 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot the 78 Motion for Extension of Time; granting 30 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Federal Claims; granting in part and denying in part 31 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs sha ll file an Amended Complaint within 21 days of the date of this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED amending the Court's Scheduling Order (Doc. 23 ) as follows: IT IS ORDERED that all discovery, including depositions of parties, witnesses, and expert s, answers to interrogatories, and supplements to interrogatories must be completed by August 1, 2013. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all dispositive motions shall be filed no later than August 30, 2013. (See document for full details). Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 5/6/13. (LAD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bryant et al v. Goodyear, City of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown McLaughlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goodyear, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William R Newman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ralph McLaughlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Bryant
Represented By: Stephen William Tully
Represented By: Sean Michael Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrea Bryant
Represented By: Sean Michael Carroll
Represented By: Stephen William Tully
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?