Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America v. W.P. Rowland Constructors Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America
Defendant: Rowland Constructors Group Incorporated, Rowland Companies Construction Group Incorporated, Rowland Texas GP, Rowland Texas LP, Rowland Companies Southeast Incorporated, W.P. Rowland Enterprises LP, 8324 E. Hartford Drive LLC, WLR Trust I, BKR Trust I Dated 9/1/05, Linda L Rowland, James B Rowland, Kimberly A Rowland, William P Rowland, W.P. Rowland Constructors Corporation, W.P. Rowland Properties Corporation, R.L.H. Associates LLC, RCCG Management Incorporated, Rowland Companies-Western Incorporated, Rowland Companies-Southwest Incorporated and Rowland Companies-Central Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2012cv00390
Filed: February 23, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Frederick J Martone
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 117 PARTIAL JUDGMENT, Plaintiff Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America shall recover judgment on Count I and Count II of its Amended Complaint, in the amounts set forth below, against the following defendants: (1) W.P. Rowland Constructors Corp ., (2) W.P. Rowland Properties Corp., (3) RCCG Management, Inc., (4) Rowland Companies-Western, Inc., (5) Rowland Companies Southwest, Inc., (6) Rowland Companies Central, Inc., (7) Rowland Constructors Group, Inc., (8) Rowland Companies Construction Group, Inc., (9) Rowland Texas, G.P., (10) Rowland Texas L.P., (11) Rowland Companies Southeast, Inc., (12) W.P. Rowland Enterprises, L.P., (13) 8324 E. Hartford Drive, LLC, (14) William P. Rowland, (15) Linda L. Rowland, (16} James B. Rowland, (17) Kimberly A. Rowland, (18) William P. Rowland and Linda L. Rowland, Trustees of the WLR Trust I, (19) James B. Rowland and Kimberly A. Rowland, Trustees of the BKR Trust I dated September 1, 2005; Plaintiff Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of Am erica shall have judgment against the defendants 1-19, and each of them, jointly and severally, on Count I of the Amended Complaint in the principal sum of $626,411.34, plus pre-judgment interest at the rate of 10% per annum from 8/16/12 th rough the date of entry of this Judgment; Plaintiff Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America shall have judgment against the defendants 1-19, and each of them, jointly and severally, on Count II of the Amended Complaint, and the defendants 1- 19 shall provide Plaintiff with collateral in the principal sum of $1,303,088.00, plus pre-judgment interest at the rate of 10% per annum from 2/10/12 through the date of entry of this Judgment; collateral may not be disbursed until indemni fiable claims are determined; the remainder of the collateral, if any, must be returned to defendants once all claims are satisfied; post-judgment interest on the principal amounts set forth above shall accrue at the rate established by 28 U.S.C.  67; 1961 from the date this Judgment is entered until paid; pursuant to Rule 54(b), Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the Court determines there is no just reason for delay and hereby directs that this partial judgment be entered forthwith. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick J Martone on 7/8/13. (REW)
June 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 113 IT IS ORDERED DENYING defendants motion for reconsideration 110 . (See attached PDF for details.) Signed by Senior Judge Frederick J Martone on 6/11/13.(JAMA)
May 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER, granting Travelers' motion for summary judgment 80 on Count 1 in the amount of $626,411.34; granting Travelers' motion for summary judgment 81 on Count 2; Defendants are ordered to provide Travelers with collateral in the to tal amount of $1,303,088 to cover Travelers financial exposure under the Bonds; collateral may not be disbursed until indemnifiable claims are determined; the remainder of the collateral, if any, must be returned to defendants once all claims are satisfied. Signed by Senior Judge Frederick J Martone on 5/21/13. (REW)
May 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER, denying the remainder of plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction 14 ; Plaintiff's requests that defendants be required to deposit $1,303,088 as collateral and that defendants be prohibited from secreting or diverting asse ts are denied; the injunction ordering defendants to use contract proceeds from bonded projects to pay bonded debts to claimants who have properly perfected a valid bond claim is affirmed 42 ; this denial is without prejudice to the right of plaintiff to file a motion showing it is entitled to preliminary injunctive relief under federal standards. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 5/15/12. (REW)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America v. W.P. Rowland Constructors Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rowland Constructors Group Incorporated
Represented By: John C Marcolini
Represented By: Chase E Halsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rowland Companies Construction Group Incorporated
Represented By: John C Marcolini
Represented By: Chase E Halsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rowland Texas GP
Represented By: Chase E Halsey
Represented By: John C Marcolini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rowland Texas LP
Represented By: Chase E Halsey
Represented By: John C Marcolini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rowland Companies Southeast Incorporated
Represented By: Chase E Halsey
Represented By: John C Marcolini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W.P. Rowland Enterprises LP
Represented By: Chase E Halsey
Represented By: John C Marcolini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 8324 E. Hartford Drive LLC
Represented By: Chase E Halsey
Represented By: John C Marcolini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WLR Trust I
Represented By: Mark P Hummels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BKR Trust I Dated 9/1/05
Represented By: Mark P Hummels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda L Rowland
Represented By: Mark P Hummels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James B Rowland
Represented By: Mark P Hummels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly A Rowland
Represented By: Mark P Hummels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William P Rowland
Represented By: Mark P Hummels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W.P. Rowland Constructors Corporation
Represented By: John C Marcolini
Represented By: Chase E Halsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W.P. Rowland Properties Corporation
Represented By: John C Marcolini
Represented By: Chase E Halsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R.L.H. Associates LLC
Represented By: John C Marcolini
Represented By: Chase E Halsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RCCG Management Incorporated
Represented By: John C Marcolini
Represented By: Chase E Halsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rowland Companies-Western Incorporated
Represented By: John C Marcolini
Represented By: Chase E Halsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rowland Companies-Southwest Incorporated
Represented By: John C Marcolini
Represented By: Chase E Halsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rowland Companies-Central Incorporated
Represented By: John C Marcolini
Represented By: Chase E Halsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America
Represented By: Chad L Schexnayder
Represented By: James L Csontos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?