Lester v. Presto Lifts Incorporated et al

Plaintiff: Steven Lester
Defendant: Presto Lifts Incorporated and Vonberg Valve Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2012cv00398
Filed: February 24, 2012
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Paul G Rosenblatt
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 5, 2013 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the 35 Motion is GRANTED. All discovery deadlines, discovery matters, and Scheduling Orders issued in the action entitled Steven Lester v. Vonberg Valve, Inc., No. 1:12-CV-05994-JBG, in the Northern District of Illinois shall serve to govern this action, 2:12-CV-00398-PHX-PGR, until such time that all discovery is completed. Upon completion of discovery, the parties shall have thirty (30)days to file any appropriate motions concerning the transfer and/or consolidation of these matters for purpose of trial with both the United States District Court for the Northern District of Illinois and the United States District Court for the District of Arizona. Signed by Senior Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 2/5/2013.(LFIG)
August 21, 2012 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 21 Defendant Vonberg Valve's Motion for Entry of Judgment. The Clerk is directed to enter a final judgment dismissing without prejudice all claims against Defendant Vonberg Valve, Inc., pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 54(b). Signed by Senior Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 8/20/12.(LSP)
June 19, 2012 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 10 Defendant Vonberg Valve's Motion to Dismiss and denying 16 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. Signed by Senior Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 6/18/12.(LSP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lester v. Presto Lifts Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Presto Lifts Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vonberg Valve Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Lester
Represented By: Robert M Caplan
Represented By: Douglas F Fisher
Represented By: Calvin John Platten, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?