Norstan Incorporated et al v. Lancaster et al

Plaintiff: Norstan Incorporated and Black Box Network Services Employee Health Plan
Defendant: Warren G Levenbaum, Steven A. Cohen Esq. PLC, Steven A Cohen, Geoffrey M. Trachtenberg PC, Geoffrey M Trachtenberg, Jennifer N Lancaster, Estate of James Joseph Lancaster, Matthew S Dana, Mark E Andersen, Samantha R Garber, Dana Law Firm PA, Levenbaum & Cohen PLC and Warren G. Levenbaum PC
Case Number: 2:2012cv00481
Filed: March 8, 2012
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: G Murray Snow
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 27, 2014 118 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment 109 is granted in part; Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment 100 is denied; granting Plaintiffs an equitable lien in the amount of $1,144,862.20 over any settlements or judgments ob tained by the Estate of Mr Lancaster from Lancaster, et al. v. Feuer, et al., CV 2010-1614; maintaining the Court's Preliminary Injunction 62 requirement that the Estate not dismiss its claims in the Lancaster, et al. v. Feuer, et al., CV 2010-1614, and that Defendants receive written approval from the Plan of any settlement with Dr Feuer and Valley Anesthesiology that does not fully satisfy the Plan's equitable lien. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 6/25/14. (REW)
August 3, 2012 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED THAT Defendants Motion to Dismiss Defendants Jennifer Lancaster and Estate of Joseph Lancaster (Doc. 32) is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Lawyer Defendants (Doc. 33) is den ied as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT Defendants' Request for Summary Disposition of Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 44) is denied as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT Defendants' Motion for Leave to Show Cause Why Preliminary Injunction Should Not Issue and Motion for Reconsideration (Doc. 50) is granted in part and denied in part. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT the temporary restraining order entered by the Court on May 30, 2012 (Doc. 48) shall remain in effect as a preliminary injunction pen ding final disposition of this matter and that the $40,000 bond filed by Plaintiffs will serve as security for both the temporary restraining order and the preliminary injunction. The Estate is enjoined from dismissing its claims against Feuer and Valley Anesthesiology in Lancaster, et al. v. Feuer, et al., CV2010-001614 except for its rights to recovery above and beyond the reasonable value of services and benefits the Plan provided to Lancaster. The Estate is also enjoined from accep ting any settlement of its claims against Feuer and Valley Anesthesiology in Lancaster, et al. v. Feuer, et al., CV2010-001614 that does not fully compensate or reimburse the Plan without the Planswritten approval. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 8/3/12.(LAD)
May 30, 2012 48 Opinion or Order of the Court TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER - Plaintiffs' Renewed Application for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunctive Relief (Doc. 37 ) is granted in part. The Estate is enjoined from dismissing its claims against Feuer and Valley Anesthesi ology in Lancaster, et al. v. Feuer, et al., CV2010-001614 except for its rights to recovery above and beyond the reasonable value of services and benefits the Plan provided to Lancaster. The Estate is enjoined from accepting any settlement of its claims against Feuer and Valley Anesthesiology in Lancaster, et al. v. Feuer, et al., CV2010-001614 that does not fully compensate or reimburse the Plan without the Plan's written approval. Plaintiffs shall, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 65(c), post a $40,000 bond as security for this temporary restraining order, which shall not become effective unless and until Plaintiffs post bond. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 5/30/2012. (KMG)
March 29, 2012 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiffs' 4 Application for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunctive Relief is denied in part without prejudice. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 03/29/12. (ESL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Norstan Incorporated et al v. Lancaster et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren G Levenbaum
Represented By: Brian Holohan
Represented By: Donald Wilson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven A. Cohen Esq. PLC
Represented By: Brian Holohan
Represented By: Donald Wilson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven A Cohen
Represented By: Brian Holohan
Represented By: Donald Wilson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geoffrey M. Trachtenberg PC
Represented By: Brian Holohan
Represented By: Donald Wilson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geoffrey M Trachtenberg
Represented By: Brian Holohan
Represented By: Donald Wilson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer N Lancaster
Represented By: Donald Wilson, Jr.
Represented By: Brian Holohan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estate of James Joseph Lancaster
Represented By: Donald Wilson, Jr.
Represented By: Brian Holohan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew S Dana
Represented By: Donald Wilson, Jr.
Represented By: Brian Holohan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark E Andersen
Represented By: Donald Wilson, Jr.
Represented By: Brian Holohan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samantha R Garber
Represented By: Donald Wilson, Jr.
Represented By: Brian Holohan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dana Law Firm PA
Represented By: Brian Holohan
Represented By: Donald Wilson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Levenbaum & Cohen PLC
Represented By: Brian Holohan
Represented By: Donald Wilson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren G. Levenbaum PC
Represented By: Brian Holohan
Represented By: Donald Wilson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norstan Incorporated
Represented By: John C West
Represented By: John Salinas Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Black Box Network Services Employee Health Plan
Represented By: John C West
Represented By: John Salinas Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?