HM Hotel Properties v. Peerless Indemnity Insurance Company et al

Plaintiff: HM Hotel Properties
Defendant: Unknown Parties and Peerless Indemnity Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2012cv00548
Filed: March 14, 2012
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 30, 2013 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 70 Defendant's Motion for Attorney Fees, Defendant is awarded attorneys' fees in the amount of $129,413.31. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 12/30/13.(LSP)
August 23, 2013 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 56 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment and denying 67 Defendant's Motion for Reconsideration. The Clerk is directed to terminate this action. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 8/23/13.(LSP)
June 18, 2012 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 8 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 6/18/2012.(NVO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HM Hotel Properties v. Peerless Indemnity Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peerless Indemnity Insurance Company
Represented By: Ian Matthew Fischer
Represented By: Amy Michelle Samberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HM Hotel Properties
Represented By: David Ali Chami
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?