Parsons et al v. Ryan et al
Plaintiff: Victor Antonio Parsons, Shawn Jensen, Stephen Oliver Swartz, Dustin Brislan, Sonia Rodriguez, Christina Verduzco, Jackie Thomas, Jeremy Smith, Robert Carrasco Gamez, Jr., Maryanne Chisholm, Desiree Licci, Joseph Hefner, Joshua Polson, Charlotte Wells and Arizona Center for Disability Law
Defendant: Charles L Ryan and Richard Pratt
Case Number: 2:2012cv00601
Filed: March 22, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Neil V Wake
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3734 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED Plaintiffs' Motion to Enforce the June 19, 2020 Order (Doc. 3686 ) is granted. Defendants must produce the remaining data, if not already disclosed, no later than September 18, 2020. Defendants must also provide a Notic e to the Court reflecting compliance.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants must pay Plaintiffs' reasonable attorneys' fees in bringing their Motion to Enforce the Court's June 19, 2020 Order (Doc. 3686 ). The parties must meet and c onfer within 21 days of this Order to attempt to reach an agreement on an amount to compensate Plaintiffs' counsel. If no agreement is reached, Plaintiffs' counsel may file a motion for attorneys' fees within 30 days of this order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs' deadline to file their Reply in support of their Motion to Enforce the Stipulation (Maximum Custody) is extended until October 2, 2020. Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to File their Reply ( Doc. 3728 ) is therefore denied as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED the Clerk of Court must terminate the Motion at Doc. 3704 as duplicative of the redacted motion filed and pending at Doc. 3694 . (See document for further details). Signed by Senior Judge Roslyn O Silver on 9/4/2020. (LAD)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3691 ORDER as to 3686 MOTION to Enforce Court's Order 3635 : IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Defendants must respond to Plaintiffs' Motion to Enforce no later than Monday August 17, 2020. Plaintiffs may file a reply no later than Wedne sday August 19, 2020. IT IS FURTHER OREDERED that Defendants must show cause in their response to the Motion to Enforce why they should not be required to pay Plaintiffs' reasonable attorneys' fees incurred in its efforts to gain compliance with the June 19, 2020 Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants cannot avoid filing their response by providing the required information to Plaintiffs. Signed by Senior Judge Roslyn O Silver on 8/13/2020. (CLB)
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3655 ORDER granting 3650 , 3654 Motions to Seal. The Clerk of Court will combine in a new entry on the docket the redacted versions of Doc. 3649 and Doc. 3653 . The Clerk of Court will file in the lodged document, Doc. 3651 , keeping the same do cket number. This Order shall not be sealed. FURTHER ORDERED no later than July 20, 2020, Defendants shall file their response to the Motion to Enforce. No later than July 23, 2020, Plaintiffs shall file their reply. Signed by Senior Judge Roslyn O Silver on 7/14/20. (MAP)
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3635 ORDER re: 3613 Discovery Dispute: IT IS ORDERED Defendants are required to respond to RFPs 66, 74, 122, 133, 134, and 138 as detailed herein within seven days of this Order. Defendants are not required to respond to RFP 116. Signed by Senior Judge Roslyn O Silver on 6/19/2020. (CLB)
May 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3596 ORDER Defendants' remedial plan for PM 44 at Tucson (Doc. 3585 ) is accepted. See attachment for details. Signed by Senior Judge Roslyn O Silver on 5/19/2020. (CLB)
April 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3574 ORDER - The Motion to Enforce the Stipulation (Doc. 3492 ) is GRANTED IN PART. FURTHER ORDERED that PM 23 at Lewis; PM 24 at Eyman, Florence, Phoenix, and Yuma; PM 40 at Florence; PM 44 at Phoenix and Tucson; PM 52 at Lewis; PM 67 at Florence; and PM 74 at Perryville are substantially noncompliant. See document for complete details. Signed by Senior Judge Roslyn O Silver on 4/23/20. (EJA)
April 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3563 ORDER: The Motions to Intervene (Doc. 3519 , 3555 ) are DENIED. The Stipulation (Doc. 3551 is DENIED. Signed by Senior Judge Roslyn O Silver on 4/17/2020. (REK)
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3556 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED Defendants are required to provide Plaintiffs the names and identification numbers of prisoners tested for COVID-19 and the results, on a weekly basis, pursuant to Paragraph 29 of the Stipulation and as part of the effort to ensure compliance with Performance Measures PMs 39-41, PMs 45-47, PMs 48-52, and PM 55. See attachment for details. Signed by Senior Judge Roslyn O Silver on 4/2/2020. (CLB)
March 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3518 ORDER: Defendants shall monitor Performance Measures 73, 74, 76, 78, 80-90, 91, 94, and 95 using the protocols set forth above. Defendants shall monitor Performance Measure 25 using the protocol set forth above. Performance Measure 67 must be monitor ed using the methodology recommended by Dr. Stern. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED no later than March 27, 2020, the parties shall file an updated version of the spreadsheet reflecting the PMs that have been terminated and those that remain pending. IT IS FURT HER ORDERED no later than March 27, 2020, Plaintiffs shall respond to Defendants' position statement as directed herein 3512 . Defendants may file a reply no later than April 3, 2020. Signed by Senior Judge Roslyn O Silver on 3/11/2020. (REK)
February 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3495 ORDER (1) The parties must confer and submit a joint statement regarding Defendants operating an "Open Clinic" no later than February 28, 2020. (2) The parties must confer and submit a joint statement as described herein as to Recommenda tions 16, 18, 19, and 44 no later than February 28, 2020. (3) Defendants must file a statement as to whether they will attempt to implement Recommendations 51, 52, 53, 54, 55, 56, 57, 59, or 60 no later than February 28, 2020. (4) The remainder o f Dr. Stern's Recommendations are accepted or not adopted as discussed herein. (5) The parties must confer and submit a document regarding the status of PMs by location no later than February 28, 2020. FURTHER ORDERED The following motions a re addressed: denying 3301 Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Compliance; denying without prejudice to refiling after issuance of the Ninth Circuit's mandate in 18-16358 3401 Plaintiffs' Motion for Attorneys' Fees; denying as moot 3413 , 3415 Defendants' Motions to Stay Enforcement of the Court's May 8, 2019 Attorney Fees' Order and Briefing on Plaintiffs' pending motion; denying 3461 Plaintiffs' Motion to Modify the Stipulation; granting 3483 Defendants' Motion to Seal; denying 3488 Class Member Richard Johnson's Motion to Enforce the Stipulation. Signed by Senior Judge Roslyn O Silver on 2/12/20. (MAP)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3452 ORDER re: Dr. Stern's communications with third parties: Because Dr. Stern's testimony might still be needed in these proceedings, he is to avoid communications with third parties regarding his work in this case. The Court will inform Dr. Stern as soon as possible after the parties' settlement conference on January 10, 2020, whether additional services will be needed or if he is free to communicate with third parties. Signed by Senior Judge Roslyn O Silver on 12/11/2019. (MMO)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3449 ORDER denying 3436 Motion to Quash. Signed by Senior Judge Roslyn O Silver on 12/9/19. (CLB)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3385 ORDER no later than October 16, 2019, the parties shall confer and inform the opposing side which of the three options they plan to pursue. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED no later than October 23, 2019, each side shall file a statement outlining how that side wishes to proceed. See attachment for details. Signed by Senior Judge Roslyn O Silver on 10/11/19. (CLB)
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3232 ORDER granting Plaintiffs' Motion to Enforce Payment of Monitoring Fees 3026 . Defendants shall ensure that Plaintiffs' August 14, 2018 invoice is paid in full within 7 days of the date of this Order with interest accruing from September 1 3, 2018, and calculated pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1961. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED granting Plaintiffs' Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs 3017 . IT IS FURTHER ORDERED awarding Plaintiffs $1,602,955.20 in attorneys' fees and $45,082.60 in costs, for a total of $1,648,037.80 pursuant to the parties' Stipulation. The Clerk of Court must enter judgment against Defendants accordingly. Signed by Senior Judge Roslyn O Silver on 5/03/2019. (REK)
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3127 ORDER re: 3111 Joint Statement re: terms of Dr. Stern's engagement. The parties agree on some issues but disagree on others. The Court will accept the portions where the parties agree and this Order addresses only the disagreements. See attachment for details. Signed by Senior Judge Roslyn O Silver on 1/31/19. (CLB)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3077 ORDER re: Magistrate Judge Duncan's jurisdiction. Signed by Senior Judge Roslyn O Silver on 12/6/18. (CLB)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3057 ORDER: Defendants' Motion for Relief from Court Order Re: Termination of Monitoring 2931 is denied. Defendants' Motion for Relief from Court Order Re: HNR Boxes 2932 is denied. Defendants' Motion to Stay 2971 is denied. Plaintiff s' Motion for Status Hearing 2999 is granted. A hearing is set for December 6, 2018, at 1:30 p.m. Defendants' Motion to Modify Order Doc. 2958 3046 is granted. Defendants' monthly compliance reports will be due on the 21st day of each month or on the business day thereafter. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED denying Michael Cohn's pro se Motion for Investigation of Fraudulent Schemes 3044 . Signed by Senior Judge Roslyn O Silver on 11/15/2018. (REK)
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3020 ORDER granting in part 2520 Plaintiff's Motion to Enforce. ORDERED that PM 48 at Tucson, PM 95 at Tucson, and PM 96 at Tucson are substantially non-compliant. FURTHER ORDERED that PM 19 at Eyman, PM 19 at Lewis, PM 52 at Phoenix, and PM 67 at Tucson are substantially non-compliant. Defendants shall file a remedial plan tailored to each of these PM/locations no later than October 22, 2018. Signed by Senior Judge Roslyn O Silver on 9/28/18. (EJA)
June 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2905 ORDER: Within 30 days of the date of this Order, Plaintiffs and Defendants shall each submit a list of two proposed experts for each of the following categories of care delineated by the Stipulation: Pharmacy, Intersystem, Transfers, Access to Care, Diagnostic Services, Specialty Care, and Chronic Care. For each proposed expert, the parties shall submit a current CV/resume and confirm that s/he is available to serve as an outside expert to Defendants. The Court will then conduct its selection process. Signed by Magistrate Judge David K Duncan on 6/22/2018. (REK)
May 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2810 ORDER re: 2520 MOTION to Enforce The Stipulation ; IT IS ORDERED that PM 50 at Tucson is substantially non-compliant. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED directing Defendants to file a remedial plan tailored to PM 50 no later than June 6, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge David K Duncan on 5/11/18. (MSA)
May 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2791 ORDER: The Motion to Disqualify Magistrate Judge Duncan from All Further Proceedings 2641 is DENIED. The Motion for Chief Judge to Rule on Defendants' Motion to Disqualify Magistrate Judge Duncan from All Further Proceedings 2693 is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED DENYING Motion for Leave for Ethics Bureau at Yale to File Brief of Amicus Curiae in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Disqualify Judge Duncan from All Further Proceedings 2729 . While the Court appreciates the willingness of law students to devote their efforts to matters they believe will assist the Court, the proposed amicus brief would not assist the Court in addressing the matter at hand. Signed by Magistrate Judge David K Duncan on 5/02/2018. (REK)
March 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2667 ORDER: Because of the various moving parts in this case, including the Court's recent ruling on the definition of substantial noncompliance, the most prudent course is for the Court to address this topic at one of the March hearings so that the Court may hear the parties' current positions and thereupon issue its ruling. Signed by Magistrate Judge David K Duncan on 3/06/2018. (REK)
February 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2644 ORDER granting Joint Motion for Clarification 2561 . See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge David K Duncan on 2/26/18. (SJF)
February 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2604 ORDER denying Corizon Health Inc.'s 2529 Renewed Motion for Leave to Participate as Amicus Curiae. Signed by Magistrate Judge David K Duncan on 2/15/2018. (ATD)
November 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2410 ORDER Denying as moot 2080 Defendants' Motion to Seal. FURTHER ORDERED granting 2137 Defendants' Motion to Seal. FURTHER ORDERED 2169 Larry Prince's Motion to Intervene. (Doc. 2169) is denied. FURTHER ORDERED granting [219 2] Plaintiffs' Motion to Seal. FURTHER ORDERED granting 2203 Defendants' Motion to Seal. FURTHER ORDERED denying 2357 Anant Tripati's Motion to Seal Declaration. FURTHER ORDERED denying 2391 Clayton Roy Gatlin's Motion Request to Improve. Signed by Magistrate Judge David K Duncan on 10/31/17.(MAP)
October 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2373 ORDER - Effective immediately, Defendants shall comply with the following performance measures at the following prisons for every class member: Performance Measure 11, 35, 39, 44, 46, 47, 50, 51, 52, 54 and 66. By Friday, 1/5/2018, Defendants shall file a list of every instance of non-compliance with this Order during December 2017. Defendants shall file a redacted list on the public docket and an unredacted list under seal. On Tuesday, 1/9/2018 Defendants shall show cause as to why the Cour t should not impose a civil contempt sanction of $1,000 per incident of non-compliance commencing the month of December 2017. If the Court finds clear and convincing evidence that Defendants have failed to take all reasonable steps to comply with this Order, the Court shall impose civil contempt sanctions on Defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge David K Duncan on 10/10/17. (DXD)
August 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2235 ORDER denying 2171 Corizon Health, Inc.'s Motion for Leave to Participate as Amicus Curiae. Signed by Magistrate Judge David K Duncan on 8/14/17.(LSP)
August 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2226 ORDER - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Defendant Ryan must appear at the Court's August 8-9, 2017 Status Conference so that the Court may address directly Defendants' compliance with the July 25, 2017 Order. Defendants must therefore make a rrangements for Defendant Ryan to appear at some point during the two days set aside for the hearing. He must be prepared to provide testimony regarding the video conference and the information conveyed to ADC employees and officials. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants must produce copies of any documents created in connection with the video conference including speaking notes, "talking points," or any power-point type presentations, as well as any documents which memorialize wha t information was communicated during the conference. Defendants must also produce copies of any documents created for employees or officials unable to participate in the teleconference. Any documents responsive to this Order must be filed no later than 6 p.m., Monday, August 7, 2017. (See document for further details). Signed by Magistrate Judge David K Duncan on 8/4/17. (SLQ)
July 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2209 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED directing Defendants and Counsel for Defendants that no actions be taken that harass, intimidate, or otherwise retaliate against the witnesses who have provided the Court information, either via oral testimony or written statem ents. This prohibition includes actions which could reasonably be viewed as having a chilling effect on witness testimony by utilizing group punishments, or actions against other prisoners who could in turn blame or target the witnesses. IT IS FUR THER ORDERED that Counsel for Defendants provide a written declaration within 7 days of the date of this Order describing all steps they took to communicate the Court's verbal orders of July 14, 2017, regarding retaliation to their clients, a nd to ensure that witnesses' freedom to communicate with the Court is protected IT IS FURTHER OREDERED that Perryville staff immediately return Ms. Scheid to her previous cell and to not enter Ms. Ashworth's cell at night when she is alon e or away working unless it is pursuant to a legitimate correctional objective. IT IS FINALLY ORDERED GRANTING the Defendants' request that the Court set this matter for an evidentiary hearing after the parties confer and present their availability to the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge David K Duncan on 7/25/2017. (REK)
July 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2179 ORDER denying 2135 Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's $1000 Sanction Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge David K Duncan on 7/13/17.(DXD)
February 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1918 ORDER: Defendants' Motion for Relief from Order Re: Close Custody 1847 is denied; Defendants' Notice and Request for Temporary Suspension of Order Regarding Close Custody 1869 is denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge David K Duncan on 2/6/17.(REW)
December 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1833 ORDER: the Monitoring Guide shall be updated to reflect compliance for PMs 27, 77, and 78 as described in this order; any inmate classified as close custody who works at least 20 hours/week is not a member of the Stipulation's Subclass; within 2 1 days, the parties shall notify the Court that they have developed a methodology for implementing this Order or that they require the Court's assistance to do so; all close custody inmates who are not part of the job program mentioned in this order are members of the Stipulation's Subclass. Signed by Magistrate Judge David K Duncan on 12/23/16. (REW)
November 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1778 ORDER: approving the unopposed redactions for the proper names set forth at the following page and line numbers of the October 5, 2016 Status Hearing transcript: page 40, lines 1, 2, 5 and 9; page 42, lines 18 and 22; denying the other requested redactions.; the Court declines to approve the other redactions for the other ADOC employees (see order for complete details). Signed by Magistrate Judge David K Duncan on 11/23/16.(REW)
November 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1754 ORDER: the outstanding issues from the 11/9/16 Status Conference are addressed in this order (see order for details). Signed by Magistrate Judge David K Duncan on 11/10/16. (REW) Modified on 11/10/2016 (REW).
August 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1065 ORDER: (1) Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (Docs. 895 , sealed at 902) is denied. (2) Plaintiff Brislan is dismissed as a Class Representative. (3) Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Defendants' Notice of Supplemental Authority (Doc. 1063 ) is denied as moot. See order for complete details. Signed by Judge Neil V. Wake on 8/7/14. (NKS)
July 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 1040 ORDER that Defendants' Motion to Preclude Plaintiffs' Experts (Docs. 905 , sealed at 900) is denied without prejudice to renewal at trial. See order for complete details. Signed by Judge Neil V. Wake on 7/28/14. (NKS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parsons et al v. Ryan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles L Ryan
Represented By: Michael Evan Gottfried
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Pratt
Represented By: Michael Evan Gottfried
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor Antonio Parsons
Represented By: James Anthony Ahlers
Represented By: Daniel Clayton Barr
Represented By: Kirstin T Eidenbach
Represented By: David Cyrus Fathi
Represented By: Amy Fettig
Represented By: John Howard Gray
Represented By: Alison Hardy
Represented By: Ilham A Hosseini
Represented By: Corene T Kendrick
Represented By: James Duff Lyall
Represented By: Caroline N Mitchell
Represented By: Sara Norman
Represented By: Daniel Joseph Pochoda
Represented By: Jill Louise Ripke
Represented By: Thomas Dean Ryerson
Represented By: Donald Specter
Represented By: Matthew Benjamin du Mee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawn Jensen
Represented By: James Anthony Ahlers
Represented By: Daniel Clayton Barr
Represented By: Kirstin T Eidenbach
Represented By: David Cyrus Fathi
Represented By: Amy Fettig
Represented By: John Howard Gray
Represented By: Alison Hardy
Represented By: Ilham A Hosseini
Represented By: Corene T Kendrick
Represented By: James Duff Lyall
Represented By: Caroline N Mitchell
Represented By: Sara Norman
Represented By: Daniel Joseph Pochoda
Represented By: Jill Louise Ripke
Represented By: Thomas Dean Ryerson
Represented By: Donald Specter
Represented By: Matthew Benjamin du Mee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Oliver Swartz
Represented By: James Anthony Ahlers
Represented By: Daniel Clayton Barr
Represented By: Kirstin T Eidenbach
Represented By: David Cyrus Fathi
Represented By: Amy Fettig
Represented By: John Howard Gray
Represented By: Alison Hardy
Represented By: Ilham A Hosseini
Represented By: Corene T Kendrick
Represented By: James Duff Lyall
Represented By: Caroline N Mitchell
Represented By: Sara Norman
Represented By: Daniel Joseph Pochoda
Represented By: Jill Louise Ripke
Represented By: Thomas Dean Ryerson
Represented By: Donald Specter
Represented By: Matthew Benjamin du Mee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dustin Brislan
Represented By: James Anthony Ahlers
Represented By: Daniel Clayton Barr
Represented By: Kirstin T Eidenbach
Represented By: David Cyrus Fathi
Represented By: Amy Fettig
Represented By: John Howard Gray
Represented By: Alison Hardy
Represented By: Ilham A Hosseini
Represented By: Corene T Kendrick
Represented By: James Duff Lyall
Represented By: Caroline N Mitchell
Represented By: Sara Norman
Represented By: Daniel Joseph Pochoda
Represented By: Jill Louise Ripke
Represented By: Thomas Dean Ryerson
Represented By: Donald Specter
Represented By: Matthew Benjamin du Mee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sonia Rodriguez
Represented By: James Anthony Ahlers
Represented By: Daniel Clayton Barr
Represented By: Kirstin T Eidenbach
Represented By: David Cyrus Fathi
Represented By: Amy Fettig
Represented By: John Howard Gray
Represented By: Alison Hardy
Represented By: Ilham A Hosseini
Represented By: Corene T Kendrick
Represented By: James Duff Lyall
Represented By: Caroline N Mitchell
Represented By: Sara Norman
Represented By: Daniel Joseph Pochoda
Represented By: Jill Louise Ripke
Represented By: Thomas Dean Ryerson
Represented By: Donald Specter
Represented By: Matthew Benjamin du Mee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina Verduzco
Represented By: James Anthony Ahlers
Represented By: Daniel Clayton Barr
Represented By: Kirstin T Eidenbach
Represented By: David Cyrus Fathi
Represented By: Amy Fettig
Represented By: John Howard Gray
Represented By: Alison Hardy
Represented By: Ilham A Hosseini
Represented By: Corene T Kendrick
Represented By: James Duff Lyall
Represented By: Caroline N Mitchell
Represented By: Sara Norman
Represented By: Daniel Joseph Pochoda
Represented By: Jill Louise Ripke
Represented By: Thomas Dean Ryerson
Represented By: Donald Specter
Represented By: Matthew Benjamin du Mee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jackie Thomas
Represented By: James Anthony Ahlers
Represented By: Daniel Clayton Barr
Represented By: Kirstin T Eidenbach
Represented By: David Cyrus Fathi
Represented By: Amy Fettig
Represented By: John Howard Gray
Represented By: Alison Hardy
Represented By: Ilham A Hosseini
Represented By: Corene T Kendrick
Represented By: James Duff Lyall
Represented By: Caroline N Mitchell
Represented By: Sara Norman
Represented By: Daniel Joseph Pochoda
Represented By: Jill Louise Ripke
Represented By: Thomas Dean Ryerson
Represented By: Donald Specter
Represented By: Matthew Benjamin du Mee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy Smith
Represented By: James Anthony Ahlers
Represented By: Daniel Clayton Barr
Represented By: Kirstin T Eidenbach
Represented By: David Cyrus Fathi
Represented By: Amy Fettig
Represented By: John Howard Gray
Represented By: Alison Hardy
Represented By: Ilham A Hosseini
Represented By: Corene T Kendrick
Represented By: James Duff Lyall
Represented By: Caroline N Mitchell
Represented By: Sara Norman
Represented By: Daniel Joseph Pochoda
Represented By: Jill Louise Ripke
Represented By: Thomas Dean Ryerson
Represented By: Donald Specter
Represented By: Matthew Benjamin du Mee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Carrasco Gamez, Jr.
Represented By: James Anthony Ahlers
Represented By: Daniel Clayton Barr
Represented By: Kirstin T Eidenbach
Represented By: David Cyrus Fathi
Represented By: Amy Fettig
Represented By: John Howard Gray
Represented By: Alison Hardy
Represented By: Ilham A Hosseini
Represented By: Corene T Kendrick
Represented By: James Duff Lyall
Represented By: Caroline N Mitchell
Represented By: Sara Norman
Represented By: Daniel Joseph Pochoda
Represented By: Jill Louise Ripke
Represented By: Thomas Dean Ryerson
Represented By: Donald Specter
Represented By: Matthew Benjamin du Mee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maryanne Chisholm
Represented By: James Anthony Ahlers
Represented By: Daniel Clayton Barr
Represented By: Kirstin T Eidenbach
Represented By: David Cyrus Fathi
Represented By: Amy Fettig
Represented By: John Howard Gray
Represented By: Alison Hardy
Represented By: Ilham A Hosseini
Represented By: Corene T Kendrick
Represented By: James Duff Lyall
Represented By: Caroline N Mitchell
Represented By: Sara Norman
Represented By: Daniel Joseph Pochoda
Represented By: Jill Louise Ripke
Represented By: Thomas Dean Ryerson
Represented By: Donald Specter
Represented By: Matthew Benjamin du Mee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Desiree Licci
Represented By: James Anthony Ahlers
Represented By: Daniel Clayton Barr
Represented By: Kirstin T Eidenbach
Represented By: David Cyrus Fathi
Represented By: Amy Fettig
Represented By: John Howard Gray
Represented By: Alison Hardy
Represented By: Ilham A Hosseini
Represented By: Corene T Kendrick
Represented By: James Duff Lyall
Represented By: Caroline N Mitchell
Represented By: Sara Norman
Represented By: Daniel Joseph Pochoda
Represented By: Jill Louise Ripke
Represented By: Thomas Dean Ryerson
Represented By: Donald Specter
Represented By: Matthew Benjamin du Mee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Hefner
Represented By: James Anthony Ahlers
Represented By: Daniel Clayton Barr
Represented By: Kirstin T Eidenbach
Represented By: David Cyrus Fathi
Represented By: Amy Fettig
Represented By: John Howard Gray
Represented By: Alison Hardy
Represented By: Ilham A Hosseini
Represented By: Corene T Kendrick
Represented By: James Duff Lyall
Represented By: Caroline N Mitchell
Represented By: Sara Norman
Represented By: Daniel Joseph Pochoda
Represented By: Jill Louise Ripke
Represented By: Thomas Dean Ryerson
Represented By: Donald Specter
Represented By: Matthew Benjamin du Mee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Polson
Represented By: James Anthony Ahlers
Represented By: Daniel Clayton Barr
Represented By: Kirstin T Eidenbach
Represented By: David Cyrus Fathi
Represented By: Amy Fettig
Represented By: John Howard Gray
Represented By: Alison Hardy
Represented By: Ilham A Hosseini
Represented By: Corene T Kendrick
Represented By: James Duff Lyall
Represented By: Caroline N Mitchell
Represented By: Sara Norman
Represented By: Daniel Joseph Pochoda
Represented By: Jill Louise Ripke
Represented By: Thomas Dean Ryerson
Represented By: Donald Specter
Represented By: Matthew Benjamin du Mee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlotte Wells
Represented By: James Anthony Ahlers
Represented By: Daniel Clayton Barr
Represented By: Kirstin T Eidenbach
Represented By: David Cyrus Fathi
Represented By: Amy Fettig
Represented By: John Howard Gray
Represented By: Alison Hardy
Represented By: Ilham A Hosseini
Represented By: Corene T Kendrick
Represented By: James Duff Lyall
Represented By: Caroline N Mitchell
Represented By: Sara Norman
Represented By: Daniel Joseph Pochoda
Represented By: Jill Louise Ripke
Represented By: Thomas Dean Ryerson
Represented By: Donald Specter
Represented By: Matthew Benjamin du Mee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arizona Center for Disability Law
Represented By: Jennifer Ann Alewelt
Represented By: Amy Fettig
Represented By: Ilham A Hosseini
Represented By: Ruth Angela Szanto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?