D'Agnese et al v. Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation

Plaintiff: Barbara D'Agnese and John D'Agnese
Defendant: Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation
Case Number: 2:2012cv00749
Filed: April 9, 2012
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: James A Teilborg
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 2, 2013 170 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment on Inadequate Warnings and Remaining Claims (Doc. 112 ) is granted. The Clerk of the Court shall enter judgment in favor of Defendant accordingly. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that De fendant's Motion for Summary Judgment on Specific Medical Causation (Doc. 110 ) is denied as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs' Punitive Damages Claim (Doc. 114 ) is denied as moot. (See document for full details). Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 7/2/13.(LAD)
January 28, 2013 139 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 83 Defendant's Daubert Motion to Exclude Testimony of Plaintiffs' Non-Retained Experts Motion as indicated in this order; denying 84 Defendant's Daubert Motion to Exclude Testimony of Dr. Mansfield. That the Court will hold a Daubert hearing on Defendant's Daubert Motion to Exclude Testimony of Dr. Vogel (Doc. 85). Denying in part 87 Defendant's Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Dr. Marx as indicated in this order a nd the Court will hold a Daubert hearing on the remainder of Defendant's Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Dr. Marx. Denying in part as indicated in this order 88 Defendant's Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Dr. Skubitz ; denying wit hout prejudice 89 Defendant's Daubert Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Dr. Parisian. That the Court will hold a Daubert hearing on Defendant's Daubert Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Wayne Ray (Doc. 90). Denying as moot 91 Defen dant's Daubert Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Dr. Fletcher. Setting a Daubert hearing for 2/14/13 at 9:00 am. as to Defendant's Motions 85 , 87 , and 88 and 90 . Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 1/28/13. (see order for full details)(DMT)
August 27, 2012 95 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation's 86 Motion for Reconsideration of Order Denying Motion to Seal Certain Documents is denied. That Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation's 93 Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion for Reconsideration of Order Denying Motion toSeal Certain Documents is granted. The Clerk of the Court shall strike Plaintiffs' Response in Opposition to the Motion for Reconsideration (Doc. 92). Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 8/27/12.(DMT)
August 16, 2012 82 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 78 Motion to Seal Certain Documents. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 8/16/12.(SJF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: D'Agnese et al v. Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara D'Agnese
Represented By: John J Vecchione
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John D'Agnese
Represented By: John J Vecchione
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation
Represented By: Thomas M Hoidal
Represented By: Katharine R Latimer
Represented By: Matthew John Malinowski
Represented By: Rachel Elizabeth Paul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?