Gamble v. Arpaio et al

Plaintiff: Bruce Allison Gamble
Defendant: Joseph M Arpaio and Unknown Majoris
Case Number: 2:2012cv00790
Filed: April 13, 2012
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Referring Judge: Lawrence O Anderson (PS)
Presiding Judge: G Murray Snow
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 4, 2013 89 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The reference to the Magistrate Judge is withdrawn as to Defendant Arpaio's Motion for Summary Judgment 63 and Plaintiff's Gamble's Motion for Extension 86 . The Motion for Summary Judgment 63 is granted. The Motion for Extension 86 is denied as moot. The Clerk of Court must enter judgment accordingly and terminate the action. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 11/4/2013.(ALS)
May 8, 2013 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, the reference to the Magistrate Judge is withdrawn as to Defendant's Motion to Enforce Release and Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice 33 and Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction 35 ; Defendant's Motion to Enforce Release and Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice 33 is denied; Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction 35 is denied. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 5/8/13.(REW)
January 11, 2013 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Defendant Joe Arpaio's Motion for Order Authorizing Defendant Sheriff Arpaio to file Motion to Dismiss under Seal 30 is denied; Defendant Joe Arpaio's deadline to file an answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint is stayed to, and including, 1/18/13. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 1/10/13.(REW)
October 9, 2012 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (Service Packet), Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend 19 is granted in part to the extent that the Clerk must file the lodged Third Amended omplaint, the Motion is denied in part with respect to all other relief requested; Counts II an d III of the Third Amended Complaint are dismissed without prejudice; Defendant Mejoris is dismissed without prejudice; Defendant Arpaio must answer Count I of the Third Amended Complaint; the Clerk must send Plaintiff a service packet including the Third Amended Complaint 21 , this Order, and both summons and request for waiver forms for Defendant Arpaio; Plaintiff must complete and return the service packet to the Clerk within 21 days; this matter is referred to Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson for all pretrial proceedings. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 10/9/12. (REW)
July 23, 2012 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend 16 is granted; Plaintiff has 30 days to file a third amended complaint in compliance with the 5/18/12 screening Order; if Plaintiff fails to file a third amended complaint within 30 days, the Court will screen the Second Amended Complaint; Plaintiff's Motion to Amend 13 is denied as moot; Plaintiff's Motion for Marshal Service Packet 15 is denied as moot. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 7/23/12. (REW)
May 18, 2012 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Plaintiff's 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis; denying Plaintiff's 8 Motion for Service of Process. The First Amended Complaint (Doc. 7) is dismissed for failure to state a claim. Plaintiff has 30 days fro m the date this Order is filed to file a second amended complaint. If Plaintiff fails to comply, the Clerk of Court must enter judgment of dismissal with prejudice that states that the dismissal may count as a "strike" under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g). The Clerk of Court must mail Plaintiff a court-approved form for filing a civil rights complaint by a prisoner. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 5/18/12. (LFIG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gamble v. Arpaio et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph M Arpaio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Majoris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce Allison Gamble
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?