Feuerstein et al v. Home Depot U.S.A. Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Janet Shalwitz and Burt Feuerstein
Defendant: Home Depot USA Incorporated, Gorilla Ladder Company, Tricam Industries Incorporated, Trex Company Incorporated and Unknown Parties
Case Number: 2:2012cv01062
Filed: May 21, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: John W Sedwick
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 121 Motion in Limine seeking to exclude the testimony of Jon Ver Halen. See PDF document for full text. Signed by Judge John W Sedwick on 6/12/14.(JWS)
June 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 84 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 86 Motion in Limine; denying 124 Motion in Limine; denying as moot 126 Motion in Limine. See PDF document for court's reasoning. Signed by Judge John W Sedwick on 6/6/14.(JWS)
March 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER AND OPINION granting 102 Motion for Leave to File Certain Exhibits in Electronic Format. Plaintiffs' Exhibits 4-16 and 6 may be submitted to the Clerk of Court in electronic format and shall thereupon become part of the record in this case. Plaintiffs shall promptly present these items to the Clerk of Court. Signed by Judge John W Sedwick on 3/21/14.(JWS)
August 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 58 Motion to Compel. The motion at docket 58 is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part as follows. Plaintiffs shall make Burt Feuerstein available for a resumed deposition at a mutually agreeable time and p lace within 21 days from the date of this order. At the deposition, Defendants may pose only those questions which are authorized by this order. Any motion to recover reasonable motion practice expenses must be made within 14 days from the date of this order. Signed by Judge John W Sedwick on 8/23/13.(JWS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Feuerstein et al v. Home Depot U.S.A. Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home Depot USA Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gorilla Ladder Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tricam Industries Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trex Company Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet Shalwitz
Represented By: Alan Rick Feuerstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Burt Feuerstein
Represented By: Alan Rick Feuerstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?