Elliott v. Google Incorporated et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: David Elliott
Defendant: Google Incorporated and Unknown Parties
Case Number: 2:2012cv01072
Filed: May 21, 2012
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Susan R Bolton
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 26, 2012 19 Minute Order: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.8(a), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge FURTHER ORDERED Case reassigned by random draw to Judge Susan R. Bolton. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV 12-1072-PHX-SRB. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
June 26, 2012 18 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
June 18, 2012 17 Featured Case ORDER pursuant to General Order 09-08 granting 16 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. (BAS)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
June 18, 2012 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 50, receipt number PHX123187 as to Janet L Cullum. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
June 18, 2012 16 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Janet L Cullum on behalf of Google Incorporated. (BAS)
June 15, 2012 15 Featured Case ORDER pursuant to General Order 09-08 granting 14 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. (BAS)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
June 15, 2012 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 50, receipt number PHX123162 as to Peter J Willsey. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
June 15, 2012 14 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Peter J Willsey on behalf of Google Incorporated. (BAS)
June 15, 2012 13 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 11 STIPULATION TO EXTEND GOOGLE, INC,'S TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT. Google Incorporated answer due 7/10/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michelle H Burns on 6/15/12. (TLJ)
June 15, 2012 12 Magistrate Election Form Deadline set as to Defendant (Attachments: # 1 Consent Form)(MAP)
June 14, 2012 11 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT by Google Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Eskay, Cara)
June 7, 2012 10 Featured Case ORDER pursuant to General Order 09-08 granting 9 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. (BAS)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
June 7, 2012 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 50, receipt number PHX122878 as to Thomas D Foster. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
June 7, 2012 9 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Thomas D Foster on behalf of David Elliott. (BAS)
June 4, 2012 8 Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
June 4, 2012 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David Elliott. Google Incorporated served on 5/25/2012. (Wirtz, Richard)
May 22, 2012 6 Featured Case ORDER pursuant to General Order 09-08 granting 5 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. (BAS)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
May 22, 2012 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 50, receipt number PHX122306 as to Richard M Wirtz. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
May 22, 2012 5 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Richard M Wirtz on behalf of David Elliott. (BAS)
May 22, 2012 4 NOTICE re of Filing Exhibits to Complaint by David Elliott re 1 Complaint. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit) (BAH)
May 21, 2012 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number PHX122261. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Magistrate Judge Michelle H. Burns. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV12-01072-PHX-MHB. Magistrate Election form attached. (Attachments: # 1 instructions) (BAH)
May 21, 2012 2 *COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 350.00, receipt number PHX122259, filed by David Elliott. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (BAH) *Document duplicate entry of (DOC. 1). Modified on 5/23/2012 (JMO).
May 21, 2012 *Summons Issued at Customer Service Intake as to Google, Incorporated (BAH) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
May 21, 2012 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 350.00, receipt number PHX122259, filed by David Elliott. (BAH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Elliott v. Google Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Elliott
Represented By: Richard Michael Wirtz
Represented By: Thomas D Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google Incorporated
Represented By: George Chun Chen
Represented By: Janet L Cullum
Represented By: Cara Molly Louise Eskay
Represented By: Robert W Shely
Represented By: Peter J Willsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?