Van DeCasteele #271090 v. Maricopa, County of et al

Plaintiff: Brent Daniel Van DeCasteele
Defendant: Maricopa, County of and Joseph M Arpaio
Case Number: 2:2012cv01158
Filed: May 30, 2012
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Pinal
Referring Judge: Bridget S Bade (PS)
Presiding Judge: Robert C Broomfield
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 8, 2013 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiff's 18 Second Amended Complaint and this action are dismissed for failure to state a claim, and the Clerk of Court must enter judgment accordingly. Plaintiff's 19 Motion for Extension of Time to File Medical Files is denied as moot. The Clerk of Court must make an entry on the docket stating that the dismissal for failure to state a claim may count as a "strike" under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g). The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3) and Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure 24(a)(3)(A), that any appeal of this decision would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 2/8/2013. (LFIG)
November 16, 2012 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - The First Amended Complaint (Doc. 15) is dismissed for failure to state a claim. Plaintiff has 30 days from the date this Order is filed to file a second amended complaint in compliance with this Order. If Plaintiff fails to file a second amended complaint within 30 days, the Clerk of Court must, without further notice, enter a judgment of dismissal of this action with prejudice that states that the dismissal may count as a "strike" under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(g). Plaintiff's motion for order requiring production of his medical records is denied as premature. (Doc. 16.) Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 11/16/12. (LAD)
September 6, 2012 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiff's motion to submit is denied to the extent that any relief is sought as moot. (Doc. 13.). Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 8/31/12. (LSP)
August 29, 2012 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made from Prison Account of Brent Daniel Van DeCasteele. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 8/28/12. (LSP)
June 28, 2012 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 2 Plaintiff's Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Within 30 days of the date this Order is filed, Plaintiff must either pay the $350.00 filing fee or file a completed Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and a certified six-month trust account statement. Clerk must enter dismissal without prejudice is Plaintiff fails to comply. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 6/28/12.(LSP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Van DeCasteele #271090 v. Maricopa, County of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brent Daniel Van DeCasteele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maricopa, County of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph M Arpaio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?