McIntosh v. Wells Fargo Bank NA et al

Plaintiff: Wayne McIntosh
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank NA and CitiBank NA
Case Number: 2:2012cv01218
Filed: June 7, 2012
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: G Murray Snow
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 7, 2013 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 56 Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.'s Motion for Summary Judgment. This action shall be terminated and the Clerk shall enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 11/6/13.(LSP)
November 19, 2012 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Defendants' 12 Motion to Dismiss is granted in part and denied in part. Defendants' 14 Motion to Transfer Bond is denied as moot. McIntosh's 15 Motion to Maintain TRO is DENIED. Defendants' 17 Motion for Ru ling is denied as moot. McIntosh's 22 Motion for Contempt is DENIED. McIntosh's 15 and 23 Motions for Summary Judgment are denied without prejudice. Defendants' 27 Motion to Strike is denied as moot. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 11/19/2012.(LFIG)
August 31, 2012 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 13 Defendants' Motion to Dissolve the TRO. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 8/31/12.(LSP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McIntosh v. Wells Fargo Bank NA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne McIntosh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank NA
Represented By: Colleen Schiman
Represented By: Gregory James Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CitiBank NA
Represented By: Gregory James Marshall
Represented By: Colleen Schiman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?