Salman et al v. Phoenix, City of et al

Plaintiff: Michael Salman and Suzanne Salman
Defendant: Phoenix, City of and Unknown Parties
Case Number: 2:2012cv01219
Filed: June 8, 2012
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: James A Teilborg
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 6, 2016 106 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 100 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Fourth Amended Complaint. The Clerk of the Court shall enter judgment in favor of Defendant and dismiss this case with prejudice. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 6/6/16. (EJA)
January 27, 2016 97 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - Plaintiffs' 84 Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint is DENIED. Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction is DENIED without prejudice. If Plaintiffs fail to file another motion to amend by Tuesday, February 16, 2016, the Clerk of the Court shall enter judgment in favor of Defendant and dismiss this case with prejudice. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 01/26/2016. (ATD)
December 21, 2015 92 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiffs' motion for TRO, (Doc. 91 ), is hereby DENIED. See order for complete details. Signed by Senior Judge James A. Teilborg on 12/21/15. (NKS)
August 27, 2015 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint (Doc. 75 ), is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if Plaintiffs fail to file another motion to amend by September 11, 2015, the Clerk of the Court shall enter judgment in favor of Defendants and dismiss this case. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 8/27/2015. (ACL)
July 14, 2015 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, that Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Salmans' Amended Complaint (Doc. 62 ) is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court shall enter judgment and dismiss the case. See document for details. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 07/13/15. (ATD)
July 9, 2012 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 44 Emergency Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 7/9/12.(MAP)
June 15, 2012 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiffs' 4 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order is denied. That Plaintiffs' 5 Motion for Preliminary Injunction is denied. That this case is dismissed without prejudice. The Clerk of the Court shall enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 6/15/12.(DMT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Salman et al v. Phoenix, City of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Salman
Represented By: Steven D Keist
Represented By: Jackson L Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Suzanne Salman
Represented By: Steven D Keist
Represented By: Jackson L Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phoenix, City of
Represented By: Bradley D Holm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?